EP1165940 - AXIAL DOVETAIL SEGMENT FOR SECURING A BUCKET TO A TURBINE WHEEL AND METHODS OF INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/01] | MEANS FOR SECURING A BUCKET TO A TURBINE WHEEL AND METHODS OF INSTALLATION | ||
[2006/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARUSO, David, Alan 214 Stage Road Ballston Lake, NY 12019 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Pedder, James Cuthbert GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00907136.6 | 03.02.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US02835 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0157365 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165940 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165940 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
F01D5/30 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/22] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AXIAL GEZINKTES SEGMENT ZUM BEFESTIGEN TURBINENSCHAUFELN AN EINEM TURBINENRAD UND EINBAUMETHODEN DAFÜR | [2006/46] | English: | AXIAL DOVETAIL SEGMENT FOR SECURING A BUCKET TO A TURBINE WHEEL AND METHODS OF INSTALLATION | [2006/46] | French: | SEGMENT AXIAL EN QUEUE D' ARONDE PERMETTANT DE FIXER UNE AUBE A UNE ROUE DE TURBINE ET SES PROCEDES D'INSTALLATION | [2006/46] |
Former [2002/01] | BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR TURBINENSCHAUFELN AN EINEM TURBINENRAD UND EINBAUMETHODEN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2002/01] | MEANS FOR SECURING A BUCKET TO A TURBINE WHEEL AND METHODS OF INSTALLATION | ||
Former [2002/01] | MOYEN PERMETTANT DE FIXER UNE AUBE A UNE ROUE DE TURBINE ET SES PROCEDES D'INSTALLATION | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4904160 (PARTINGTON ALBERT J [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 16; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US3746468 (SAUNDERS P) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 15; figures 1,2,4 *; | [XY]US3627448 (RUPP DONALD R, et al) [X] 6,7 * column 1, lines 1-65; figure 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 4,8; | [Y]US5183389 (GILCHRIST ALAN R [US], et al) [Y] 4,8 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4451205 (HONDA KEITH T [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 18 *; | [A]DE3028701 (AEG KANIS TURBINEN [DE]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPS61275503 ; | [A]JPS614808 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870428), vol. 011, no. 135, Database accession no. (M - 585), & JP61275503 A 19861205 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860531), vol. 010, no. 151, Database accession no. (M - 483), & JP61004808 A 19860110 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |