EP1165652 - POLYCARBONATES SIUTABLE FOR USE IN OPTICAL ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Gary, Charles 5 Felicia Court Albany, NY 12205 / US | 02 /
CARUSO, Andrew, James 1086 Gillespie Street Schenectady, NY 12308 / US | 03 /
WETZEL, Joseph, Richard 1 Tammy Court Watervliet, NY 12189 / US | 04 /
HARIHARAN, Ramesh 82C Yorkshire Drive Guilderland, NY 12084 / US | 05 /
WISNUDEL, Marc, Brian 4 Amity Pointe Court Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | [2002/10] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
DAVIS, Gary, Charles 5 Felicia Court Albany, NY 12205 / US | ||
02 /
CARUSO, Andrew, James 1086 Gillespie Street Schenectady, NY 12308 / US | |||
03 /
WETZEL, Joseph, Richard 1 Tammy Court Watervliet, NY 12189 / US | |||
04 /
HARIHARAN, Ramesh 82C Yorkshire Drive Guilderland, NY 12084 / US | |||
05 /
WISNUDEL, Marc, Brian 192 Tallow Wood Drive Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr. London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00907208.3 | 07.02.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US03160 | Priority number, date | US19990272088 | 18.03.1999 Original published format: US 272088 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055237 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165652 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165652 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/06, C08G63/64, G11B7/24 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C08G64/06 (EP,US);
C08G63/64 (EP,US);
G11B7/2534 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | IN OPTISCHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN VERWENDBARE POLYCARBONATE | [2002/01] | English: | POLYCARBONATES SIUTABLE FOR USE IN OPTICAL ARTICLES | [2002/01] | French: | POLYCARBONATES APTES A UNE UTILISATION DANS DES ARTICLES OPTIQUES | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 15.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2003 | BE | 10.12.2003 | CH | 10.12.2003 | CY | 10.12.2003 | FI | 10.12.2003 | FR | 10.12.2003 | IT | 10.12.2003 | LI | 10.12.2003 | NL | 10.12.2003 | LU | 07.02.2004 | IE | 09.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | DK | 10.03.2004 | GB | 10.03.2004 | GR | 10.03.2004 | SE | 10.03.2004 | ES | 21.03.2004 | PT | 10.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
CY | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
FR | 10.12.2003 | ||
IT | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GB | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
CY | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
FR | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GB | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
FR | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GB | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GB | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 10.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]JPH04345616 ; | [X]WO8000348 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,20-22,26 * examples 1-3; claim 1; table . * * page 7, line 20 - line 22 *; | [D]US4304899 (MARK VICTOR, et al); | JPH01101327 [ ] (DAICEL CHEM); | JPH01178518 [ ] (DAICEL CHEM); | JPH0752271 [ ] (TEIJIN LTD); | [X]US5578406 (OJIMA FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,20-23,26,32 * column A; examples 4,18-20 *; | [X]EP0787756 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,20,22-26,32,35,36,40-42 * abstract * * page 10, line 56 - page 11, line 1 *; | [DA]EP0846711 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 1,6-8,22-25* abstract *; | [D]JPH10176046 (TEIJIN LTD); | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900122), vol. 112, no. 4, Database accession no. 21468, XP002139029 [X] 1,4,11,22-26,32,35,36,40-42 * abstract * * RN 123262-62-4 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900122), vol. 112, no. 4, Database accession no. 21445, XP002139030 [X] 1,4,11,22-27,32,35,36,38,40-42 * abstract * * RN 124331-83-5 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980921), vol. 129, no. 12, Database accession no. 149390, XP002139031 [X] 1,2,4,5,22,23,26,32,40 * abstract * * RN 210757-76-9 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950918), vol. 123, no. 12, Database accession no. 156566, XP002139032 [X] 1,22,23,26,32 * abstract * * RN 166523-22-4 * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 04, Database accession no. 1993-029340, XP002139033 & JPH04345616 A 19921201 (NIPPON GE PLASTICS KK) [DA] 1,3,6,9,10,22-25,32-36 * abstract * |