EP1165541 - DIMERIC COMPOUNDS AND AS INHIBITORS OF NEURAMINIDASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTA SCIENTIFIC MANAGEMENT PTY. LTD. Level 4, 616 St Kilda Road Melbourne, VIC 3004 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states BIOTA SCIENTIFIC MANAGEMENT PTY. LTD. Level 4, 616 St Kilda Road Melbourne, VIC 3004 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Wen-Yang 34 Munro Avenue Mount Waverly, VIC 3149 / AU | 02 /
JIN, Betty 34 Munro Avenue Mount Waverly, VIC 3149 / AU | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2002/01] | Moy, David, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00907354.5 | 09.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000AU00165 | Priority number, date | AU1999PP09139 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: AU PP913999 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055149 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165541 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165541 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D309/28, A61K31/7012, A61K31/351, A61P31/16 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C07D309/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/351 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/55 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/59 (EP,US);
A61K47/595 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | 02.10.2001 | LT | 02.10.2001 | LV | 02.10.2001 | MK | 02.10.2001 | RO | 02.10.2001 | SI | 02.10.2001 | Title | German: | DIMERVERBINDUNGEN UND ALS INHIBITOREN DER NEURAMIDINASE | [2002/01] | English: | DIMERIC COMPOUNDS AND AS INHIBITORS OF NEURAMINIDASE | [2002/01] | French: | COMPOSES DIMERES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA NEURAMINIDASE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 02.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Request for further processing for: | 29.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2005 | BE | 11.05.2005 | CH | 11.05.2005 | CY | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | LI | 11.05.2005 | NL | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/22] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10182686 ; | [X]JPH0638784 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981124), vol. 1998, no. 22, & JP10182686 A 19980707 (NGK INSULATORS LTD.) [X] 1,2,10,13 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 12, Database accession no. 1994-094845, XP002194850 & JPH0638784 A 19940215 (MEIJI MILK PRODUCT CO. LTD.) [X] 1,2,10,13 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO9803524 ; | [X]WO9317033 (BIOMEMBRANE INST [US]); | [X]US5243035 (NAKABAYASHI SATORU [JP], et al); | [A]WO9406467 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al); | [X]WO9626933 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [A]EP0747063 (CONNAUGHT LAB [CA]); | [X]WO9731006 (GLYCOMED INC [US]); | [X]WO9733896 (GELTEX PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [X]US5759823 (WONG CHI-HUEY [US], et al) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1998-120680/11, & WO9803524 A1 19980129 (SEIKAGAKU) | [X] - MEINDL P. ET AL., "Inhibition of neuraminidase activity by derivatives of 2-deoxy-2,3-dehydro-N-acetyl-neuraminic acid", VIROLOGY,, (1974), vol. 58, no. 2, pages 457 - 463 | [X] - MEINDL P. ET AL., "Synthese und eigen schaften von 2-deoxy-2,3-dehydroneuraminsaure sowie neuer n-acylderivative", MONATSHEFTE FUR CHEMIE,, (1973), vol. 104, no. 2, pages 402 - 414 |