EP1161830 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A DISPLACEMENT OF IMAGES IN AN IMAGE SEQUENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGELSBERG, Andreas Steingrube 21 D-31141 Hildesheim / DE | [2001/50] | Application number, filing date | 00907436.0 | 15.01.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000DE00137 | Priority number, date | DE1999109622 | 05.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909622 | [2001/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054497 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161830 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161830 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/14 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
G06T7/223 (EP,US);
H04N23/683 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/16] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER VERSCHIEBUNG VON BILDERN EINER BILDSEQUENZ | [2001/50] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A DISPLACEMENT OF IMAGES IN AN IMAGE SEQUENCE | [2001/50] | French: | PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER UN DECALAGE D'IMAGES D'UNE SEQUENCE D'IMAGES | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4924310 (VON BRANDT ACHIM [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 42 - column 6, line 6; figures 2,6,7 *; | [A]EP0449283 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0535746 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 50 - column 5, line 36 * [A] 5-12; | [Y]EP0631432 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 1-4,12 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 34 ** column 6, line 10 - column 8, line 16; figures 6-10 *; | [Y]EP0762774 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,4,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 25 * |