EP1159157 - DECORATIVE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDMAYER, Gerhard Unteranger 38 D-85457 Wörth / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Siegfried Lohestrasse 5A D-85305 Jetzendorf / DE | 03 /
VORNHOF, Klaus Jagdstrasse 5a D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 04 /
WITZ, Grégoire Karlstrasse 14 D-42105 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
KERKHOFF, Markus Hesselnbergstrasse 63 D-42284 Wuppertal / DE | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Schernhammer, Herbert, et al Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-5 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Schernhammer, Herbert, et al Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3 80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00907666.2 | 03.03.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000EP01881 | Priority number, date | DE1999109472 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909472 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0051843 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159157 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159157 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B60R13/02 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60K35/20 (EP);
B60Q3/78 (EP);
B60Q3/85 (EP);
B60K37/00 (EP);
B60R2013/0287 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DEKORELEMENT | [2001/49] | English: | DECORATIVE ELEMENT | [2001/49] | French: | ELEMENT DECORATIF | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5434013 (FERNANDEZ ROBERT [US]); | [A]GB2308216 (WALTON MICHAEL BERNARD [GB]); | [A]DE29802608U (HOCHSTAETTER BERND [DE]); | [A]DE29808949U (SIDLER GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]DE19724486 (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]) |