EP1166416 - CABLE CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLAF JOHANNSEN APS Sundgade 22 6400 Sonderborg / DK | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANNSEN, Olaf Sundgade 22 DK-6400 S nderborg / DK | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S, Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V. / DK | Application number, filing date | 00909064.8 | 09.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000DK00099 | Priority number, date | DK20030000990 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: DK 99003 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0057525 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1166416 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/06, H01R13/595 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H02G3/0666 (EP,US);
H01R13/595 (EP,US);
H02G3/088 (EP,US);
H02G3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KABELKLEMME | [2002/01] | English: | CABLE CLAMP | [2002/01] | French: | SERRE-CABLE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2001 | Translation filed | 11.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 02.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4389082 (LINGARAJU BHARTOOR); | [A]US4931023 (BROWNE ALAN R [US]); | [A]DE4133025 (JOHANNSEN OLAF APS [DK]); | [A]US5866853 (SHEEHAN ROBERT K [US]) |