EP1173943 - METHOD OF GENERATING AND/OR DETECTING SYNCHRONIZATION SEQUENCES, SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD, TRANSMITTER UNIT AND RECEIVER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAAF, Bernhard Maxhofstr. 62 D-81475 München / DE | 02 /
MICHEL, Jürgen Frundsbergstr. 44 D-80634 München / DE | [2002/04] | Application number, filing date | 00909187.7 | 16.02.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000EP01263 | Priority number, date | DE1999119545 | 29.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19919545 | EP19990109791 | 18.05.1999 Original published format: EP 99109791 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067405 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1173943 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173943 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04J13/00, H04L7/04, H04B1/707, H04B7/26 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
H04L7/041 (EP,US);
H04L7/00 (KR);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B1/7073 (EP,US);
H04B1/7093 (EP,US);
H04B7/2662 (EP);
H04J13/0014 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG BZW. ERMITTLUNG EINER SYNCHRONISATIONSFOLGE, VERFAHREN ZUR SYNCHRONISATION, SENDEEINHEIT UND EMPFANGSEINHEIT | [2002/04] | English: | METHOD OF GENERATING AND/OR DETECTING SYNCHRONIZATION SEQUENCES, SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD, TRANSMITTER UNIT AND RECEIVER UNIT | [2002/04] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FORMER ET POUR DETERMINER UNE SEQUENCE DE SYNCHRONISATION, PROCEDE DE SYNCHRONISATION, UNITE D'EMISSION ET UNITE DE RECEPTION | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 18.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 19.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO9639749 (OMNIPOINT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,11-16,19,20 * column A * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, column 5 * * page 84, line 1 - line 23 * [A] 4,5,21 [Y] 3,7,10,17,18; | [E]WO0014915 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,9,11-16,19,20* the whole document *; | [Y] - SRDJAN BUDISIN, "GOLAY COMPLEMENTARY SEQUENCES ARE SUPERIOR TO PN SEQUENCES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS ENGINEERING,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1992), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0734-8, pages 101 - 104, XP000319401 [Y] 3,7,10,17,18 * abstract * * Teile 1, 6 und 7 * | [Y] - BUDISIN S Z, "NEW COMPLEMENTARY PAIRS OF SEQUENCES", ELECTRONICS LETTERS,GB,IEE STEVENAGE, (19900621), vol. 26, no. 13, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 881 - 883, XP000107922 [Y] 3,7,10,17,18 * the whole document * | [A] - MASKARA S L ET AL, "CONCATENATED SEQUENCES FOR SPREAD SPECTRUM SYSTEMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (198105), vol. AES-17, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9251, pages 342 - 350, XP000791008 [A] 1-21 * abstract * * Teil II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAES.1981.309061 |