EP1159144 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A COVERING ELEMENT FOR POTENTIALLY BREAKABLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/49] | ON | ||
[2002/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Rochus Jogerst GmbH Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 1 77704 Oberkirch / DE | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPÖRLE, Frank Lindenberg 8 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
WALTER, Michael Oberdorfstrasse 5 D-77704 Oberkirch/Baden / DE | 03 /
WARMUTH, Anita Pebble Bay Condominium Block 4, 12-12 130 Tanjong Rhu Road Singapore 436918 / SG | [2001/49] | Application number, filing date | 00909218.0 | 19.02.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000EP01376 | Priority number, date | DE1999109642 | 05.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909642 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053433 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159144 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159144 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B44C5/04, B29C70/68 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B44C5/0453 (EP);
B29C43/203 (EP);
B29C70/682 (EP);
B29C70/70 (EP);
B44C3/04 (EP);
B44C5/0438 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/18] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERKLEIDUNGSTEILS VON BRUCHGEFÄHRDETEM MATERIAL | [2001/49] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A COVERING ELEMENT FOR POTENTIALLY BREAKABLE MATERIAL | [2002/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT DE REVETEMENT COMPORTANT UNE MATIERE SUJETTE A LA RUPTURE | [2001/49] |
Former [2001/49] | ON | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2305148 (JOHN JEREMY MARTIN [GB]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5078815 (OTHON ROBERT S) [A] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 44 - column 1, line 57; figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 33 - column 3, line 35 *; | [DA]US4923539 (SPENGLER GERHARD [DE], et al) [DA] 4 * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 4; figure 4 *; | [A]DE1948663 (KUNSTSTOFFBAU GMBH) [A] 5,9,10 * abstract * |