EP1165028 - USE OF SURFACTANT MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotec Pharmacon ASA Strandgaten 3 9008 Tromsö / NO | [2002/49] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Biotec Asa Strandgata 3 9008 Tromsö / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIESBACH, Ute Ludolfstr. 13 D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
WACHTER, Rolf Clausthal-Zellerfelder-Str. 48 D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
FABRY, Bernd Danziger Str. 31 D-41352 Korschenbroich / DE | 04 /
ENGSTAD, Rolf, E. Strandgata 3 N-9008 Tromso / NO | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00909298.2 | 03.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000EP01828 | Priority number, date | DE1999111055 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19911055 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054739 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165028 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165028 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
A23G4/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/736 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENAKTIVEN GEMISCHEN | [2002/01] | English: | USE OF SURFACTANT MIXTURES | [2002/01] | French: | UTILISATION DE MELANGES TENSIOACTIFS | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 01.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.08.2004 | IE | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | AT | 03.03.2005 | CY | 03.03.2005 | LU | 03.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 03.03.2005 | ||
CY | 03.03.2005 | ||
LU | 03.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 03.03.2005 | ||
LU | 03.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 03.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10287536 ; | [DA]US3931398 (GAFFAR ABDUL, et al) [DA] 1 * claim - *; | [A]GB2176795 (FMC CORP) [A] 1,9,10 * page 6; example G *; | [D]DE4406748 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]WO9523582 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,9,10 * claim - *; | [AD]WO9530022 (BIOTEC MACKZYMAL AS [NO], et al) [AD] 1,4-6 * claim - *; | [A]WO9530403 (LARM OLLE [SE]) [A] 1,8-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9932073 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [PA] 1-10* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10287536 A 19981027 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1,4,5,9,10 * abstract * |