|
16.07.2003 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
14.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.04.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.04.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/429 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.02.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
28.02.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
28.02.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.10.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.09.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.09.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |