02.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
08.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
10.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
20.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
10.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
18.07.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
15.04.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
28.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
15.02.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] |
26.07.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
14.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2001 |
First examination report |
|
11.12.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.10.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
19.10.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
31.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
29.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|