Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3287600 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI990484 | 10.03.1999 | EP0002045 | 08.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1159577 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2002 | B1 | EP1159577 | 05.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI990484 | 10.03.1999 | EP0002045 | 08.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE224037T | 15.09.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI990484 | 10.03.1999 | EP0002045 | 08.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365936 | 14.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI990484 | 10.03.1999 | EP0002045 | 08.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60000448D1 | 17.10.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI990484 | 10.03.1999 | EP0002045 | 08.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6863532 | 08.03.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI990484 | 10.03.1999 | EP0002045 | 08.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0053996 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI990484 | 10.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1310313 | 11.02.2002 | B1 | ITMI990484 | 10.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI990484 | 10.03.1999 |