EP1159577 - EQUIPMENT FOR DETECTING THAT A TARGET HAS RECEIVED A DIRECT HIT FROM A SIMULATED WEAPON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ambrosoli, Franco Via Dolores Bello 5 28100 Novara / IT | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBROSOLI, Franco Via Dolores Bello 5 I-28100 Novara / IT | 02 /
PORZIO, Massimo Via Cavourt 12 I-28068 Romentino-Novara / IT | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00910792.1 | 08.03.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000EP02045 | Priority number, date | IT1999MI00484 | 10.03.1999 Original published format: IT MI990484 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053996 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159577 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159577 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/26 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
F41G3/2655 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | 23.08.2001 | RO | 23.08.2001 | SI | 23.08.2001 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTDECKUNG, DASS EIN ZIEL EINEN DIREKTEN TREFFER VON EINER SIMULIERTEN WAFFE BEKOMMEN HAT | [2001/49] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR DETECTING THAT A TARGET HAS RECEIVED A DIRECT HIT FROM A SIMULATED WEAPON | [2001/49] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DETECTANT LES COUPS AU BUT DANS UN SIMULATEUR DE TIR | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2002 | BE | 11.09.2002 | CH | 11.09.2002 | FI | 11.09.2002 | FR | 11.09.2002 | GR | 11.09.2002 | LI | 11.09.2002 | NL | 11.09.2002 | DK | 11.12.2002 | SE | 11.12.2002 | DE | 12.12.2002 | PT | 18.12.2002 | CY | 08.03.2003 | LU | 08.03.2003 | IE | 10.03.2003 | ES | 28.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
FR | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
CY | 08.03.2003 | ||
LU | 08.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
CY | 08.03.2003 | ||
LU | 08.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
CY | 08.03.2003 | ||
LU | 08.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
CY | 08.03.2003 | ||
LU | 08.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
LU | 08.03.2003 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
IE | 10.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
DE | 12.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 11.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4487583 (BRUCKER STEPHEN E [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6-8,14 * column A * * column 2, line 28 - column 11, line 20; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US4899039 (TAYLOR LEO O [US], et al) [A] 1-3* column A; figure 1 *; | [XA]US5344320 (INBAR MOTTI [IL], et al) [X] 1 * column A * * column 3, line 19 - column 5, line 19; figures 1-18 * [A] 2,6-8,10-12; | [A]WO9909368 (TIGER ELECTRONICS LTD [US]) [A] 1,2,8 * abstract * * page 5, line 20 - page 14, line 32; figures 1-6 * |