EP1189694 - CATALYSTS FOR THE GAS-PHASE OXIDATION OF ETHYLENE AND ACETIC ACID TO VINYL ACETATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Chemicals Europe GmbH Lurgiallee 14 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGEMEYER, Alfred Apt J-302, 655 S. Fair Oaks Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
WERNER, Harald Victor-Achard-Strasse 14a D-61350 Bad Homburg / DE | 03 /
DINGERDISSEN, Uwe Linné-Weg 1 D-64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 04 /
KÜHLEIN, Klaus Fasanenstrasse 41 D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | 05 /
DAMBECK, Günter Sackgasse 9 D-65618 Selters / DE | 06 /
GEISS, Gerhardt An der Untermühle 2 D-65835 Liederbach / DE | 07 /
RUTSCH, Andrea Bürgermeister-Klingler-Strasse 5 D-64546 Mörfelden / DE | 08 /
WEIDLICH, Stephan Dürkheimer Strasse 37 D-65934 Frankfurt / DE | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00910867.1 | 21.03.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000EP02455 | Priority number, date | DE19991014066 | 27.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19914066 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0058008 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1189694 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189694 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/58, C07C67/055 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
B01J23/66 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (KR);
B01J23/52 (EP,US);
B01J23/58 (EP,US);
B01J27/135 (KR);
B01J37/0009 (KR);
C07C67/055 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/055, C07C69/01 (EP,US);
C07C67/055, C07C69/15 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOREN FÜR DIE GASPHASENOXIDATION VON ETHYLEN UND ESSIGSÄURE ZU VINYLACETAT, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2002/13] | English: | CATALYSTS FOR THE GAS-PHASE OXIDATION OF ETHYLENE AND ACETIC ACID TO VINYL ACETATE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2002/13] | French: | CATALYSEURS PERMETTANT L'OXYDATION EN PHASE GAZEUSE DE L'ETHYLENE ET DE L'ACIDE ACETIQUE EN ACETATE DE VINYLE, LEUR FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | IE | 22.06.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | LU | 21.03.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2012/31] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0565952 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DX] 1-3,5,6,8-11,23 * claims 1-18 ** examples 1-3 *; | [X]EP0672453 (STANDARD OIL CO OHIO [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11,23 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0723810 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DX] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0839793 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [DX] 1-23 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 18 * |