EP1161218 - METHOD FOR MAKING PHARMACEUTICAL TABLETS BY COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TALC DE LUZENAC 09250 Luzenac / FR | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARSEGUEL, Didier Chemin du Guerrier F-31450 Deyme / FR | 02 /
BAEZA, Richard 1, rue de la Beauce F-31100 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Fernand Bois des Dames F-31320 Aureville / FR | 04 /
TORTOSA, Florence 196, avenue du Comminges F-31860 Labarthe sur Leze / FR | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | BARRE LAFORGUE 95, rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés 95, rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 00910934.9 | 14.03.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000FR00609 | Priority number, date | FR19990003230 | 16.03.1999 Original published format: FR 9903230 | [2001/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054725 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161218 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161218 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/10 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
B30B15/0011 (EP);
A61J3/10 (EP);
A61K9/2009 (EP);
A61K9/2095 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN TABLETTEN DURCH PRESSUNG | [2001/50] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING PHARMACEUTICAL TABLETS BY COMPRESSION | [2001/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMPRIMES PHARMACEUTIQUES PAR COMPRESSION | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 30.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2004 | FI | 27.10.2004 | NL | 27.10.2004 | DK | 27.01.2005 | GR | 27.01.2005 | SE | 27.01.2005 | CY | 14.03.2005 | LU | 14.03.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | BE | 31.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2010/20] |
Former [2008/03] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
CY | 14.03.2005 | ||
IT | 14.03.2005 | ||
LU | 14.03.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/34] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
CY | 14.03.2005 | ||
IT | 14.03.2005 | ||
LU | 14.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
CY | 14.03.2005 | ||
LU | 14.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
CY | 14.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5376382 (GOEDE JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,9 * column 4, line 14 - line 54 *; | [A]EP0667147 (FUISZ TECHNOLOGIES LTD [US]) [A] 1,6,9* page 7, line 24 - line 41 * |