blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1162980

EP1162980 - PYRIDOXINE COMPOUNDS IN THE TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR PATHOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/51]USE OF PYRIDOXINE COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR AND RELATED PATHOLOGIES
[2003/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2004
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.02.2005  [2005/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medicure Inc.
4-1200 Waverly Street Winnipeg
Manitoba R3T 0P4 / CA
For all designated states
The University of Manitoba
Room 202 Administration Building
Winnipeg, Manitoba R3T 2N2 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
Medicure Inc.
4-1200 Waverly Street
Winnipeg, Manitoba R3T 0P4 / CA
For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF MANITOBA
Room 202 Administration Building
Winnipeg, Manitoba R3T 2N2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / DHALLA, Naranjan, S.
52 River Pointe Drive
Winnipeg, Manitoba R2M 5N6 / CA
02 / SETHI, Rajat
3 Bunton Court
Winnipeg, Manitoba R3X 1K4 / CA
03 / DAKSHINAMURTI, Krishnamurti
934 Crestview Park Drive
Winnipeg, Manitoba R2Y 0V7 / CA
 [2002/22]
Former [2001/51]01 / DHALLA, Naranjan, S.
52 River Pointe Drive
Winnipeg, Manitoba R2M 5N6 / CA
02 / SETHI, Rajat
68 Sauve Crescent
Winnipeg, Manitoba R2N 3K9 / CA
03 / DAKSHINAMURTI, Krishnamurti
934 Crestview Park Drive
Winnipeg, Manitoba R2Y 0V7 / CA
Representative(s)Lotti, Giorgio
c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61
10128 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Lotti, Giorgio
c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61
10128 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date00911153.522.03.2000
[2001/51]
WO2000IB00340
Priority number, dateUS1999027628025.03.1999         Original published format: US 276280
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0057863
Date:05.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1162980
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162980
Date:18.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.04.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/675, A61K31/4415, A61P9/10
[2001/51]
CPC:
A61K31/675 (EP,US); A61K31/4415 (EP,US); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/04 (EP); A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PYRIDOXIN-DERIVATE IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON KARDIOVASKULÄREN BESCHWERDEN[2003/36]
English:PYRIDOXINE COMPOUNDS IN THE TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR PATHOLOGIES[2003/36]
French:DERIVES DE PYRIDOXINE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE PATHOLOGIES CARDIOVASCULAIRES[2003/36]
Former [2001/51]VERWENDUNG DER PYRIDOXIN-DERIVATEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KARDIOVASKULÄREN UND VERWANDTEN BESCHWERDEN
Former [2001/51]USE OF PYRIDOXINE COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR AND RELATED PATHOLOGIES
Former [2001/51]TRAITEMENT DE PATHOLOGIES CARDIOVASCULAIRES ET APPARENTEES
Entry into regional phase10.09.2001National basic fee paid 
10.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2003Fee for grant paid
04.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]FR5801M  (BEAF) [X] 7 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2034539  (SOC D ETUDES PROD CHIMIQUE [FR]) [X] 7 * page 1, lines 4-19 *;
 [PX]WO9953928  (UNIV MANITOBA [CA], et al) [PX] 1,7,9 * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 3, lines 1-3, paragraph 5 *;
 [X]  - FOLSOM, AARON R. ET AL, "Prospective study of coronary heart disease incidence in relation to fasting total homocysteine, related genetic polymorphisms, and B vitamins The Atherosclerosis Risk in Communities (ARIC) study", CIRCULATION ( 1998 ), 98(3), 204-210, XP000965312 [X] 1,4-6,9,12-14 * page 209, column L, paragraph 3 *
 [X]  - RIMM ET AL, "Folate and vitamin B6 from diet and supplements in relation to risk of coronary heart disease among women", JAMA, (1998), vol. 279, no. 5, pages 359 - 364, XP000965325 [X] 1,4-7,9,11-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.279.5.359
 [X]  - KUBYSHKIN V F, ET AL, "COMPARATIVE CHARACTERISTICS OF THE ARRHYTHMIC SYNDROME AND THE POSSIBILITY FOR ITS COENZYME CORRECTION IN DILATED AND HYPERTROPHIC CARDIOMYOPATHY", medline, (19000101), Database accession no. 90085046, XP002154067 [X] 1,3 * the whole document *
    [ ] - KUBYSHKIN, "[Comparative characteristics of the arrhythmic syndrome and the possibility for its coenzyme correction in dilated and hypertrophic cardiomyopathy]. Sravnitel'naia kharakteristika aritmicheskogo sindroma i vozmozhnosti ego kofermentnoi korrektsii pri dilatatsionnoi i gipertroficheskoi kardiomiopatii", TERAPEVTICHESKII ARKHIV, (1989), vol. 61, no. 9, pages 82 - 85, XP000965693
 [X]  - LEVY H A ET AL, "Pyridoxine deficiency in congestive heart failure.", PROC SOC EXP BIOL MED, (1959 AUG-SEPT) 101 617-21., XP000965627 [X] 9,12-14 * page 621 * * page 618, column L * * page 620, column R *
 [X]  - MENDELSOHN ET AL, "Hemodynamic and clinical effects of oral levodopa in children with congestive heart failure", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, (19970701), vol. 30, pages 237 - 242, XP000965154 [X] 9,14 * page 238, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0735-1097(97)00109-5
 [A]  - AYBAK ET AL, "Effect of oral pyridoxine hydrochloride supplementation on arterial blood pressure in patients with essential hypertension", ARZNEIMITTEL FORSCHUNG, (19951201), vol. 45, no. 12, pages 1271 - 1273, XP000961002 [A] 7 * page 1272, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1271, column L, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  - MANORE M M ET AL, "CHANGES IN PLASMA PYRIDOXAL PHOSPHATE PLP IN DIABETIC D HYPERTENSIVE HTN AND HYPERTENSIVE -DIABETIC HTN-D ME FED A CONSTANT VITAMIN B-6 B6 DIET.", 75TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, ATLANTA, GEORGIA, USA, APRIL 21-25, 1991. FASEB (FE AM SOC EXP BIOL) J. (1991) 5 (4), A586., XP000961053 [A] 7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MULVANEY D A ET AL, "Electrocardiographic changes in vitamin B6 deficient rats.", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, (1979 SEP) 13 (9) 506-13., XP000965568 [A] 1,3-6,9,11-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/cvr/13.9.506
 [A]  - BHAGAVAN H N ET AL, "Effect of postweanling pyridoxine deficiency on growth and concentration of the coenzyme pyridoxal -5'-phosphate in heart, kidneys, lungs, and adrenals in rats.", PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, (1976 AUG) 10 (8) 730-2., XP000965630 [A] 1,3-6 * page 731 *
 [A]  - TAKUMA ET AL, "Combination therapy of infantile spasms with high-dose pyridoxal phosphate and low-dose corticotropin", JOURNAL OF CHILD NEUROLOGY, (19960101), vol. 11, pages 35 - 40, XP000965567 [A] 7,8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - VIDRIO H, "Interaction with pyridoxal as a possible mechanism of hydralazine hypotension", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (19900101), vol. 15, pages 150 - 156, XP000965625 [A] 7,8 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.