EP1152998 - HIGH-STRENGTH MAGNESIA PARTIALLY STABILIZED ZIRCONIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carpenter Advanced Ceramics, Inc. 13395 New Airport Road Auburn, CA 95602 / US | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUART, Martin, D. 74 Ludstone Street Hampton, VIC 3188 / AU | 02 /
TA, Wilson, H. 9/138 Westall Road Springvale, VIC 3171 / AU | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00911638.5 | 24.01.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000US01804 | Priority number, date | US19990117250P | 26.01.1999 Original published format: US 117250 P | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043327 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152998 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152998 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/486 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
C04B35/486 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Extension states | AL | 13.07.2001 | LT | 13.07.2001 | LV | 13.07.2001 | MK | 13.07.2001 | RO | 13.07.2001 | SI | 13.07.2001 | Title | German: | MAGNESIUMOXID-TEILSTABILISIERTES ZIRKONOXID HOHER FESTIGKEIT | [2001/46] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH MAGNESIA PARTIALLY STABILIZED ZIRCONIA | [2001/46] | French: | CORPS A RESISTANCE ELEVEE A LA MAGNESIE PARTIELLEMENT STABILISEE AU ZIRCONIUM | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.11.2003 | LU | 24.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | GR | 05.02.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 05.11.2003 | |
LU | 24.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | LU | 24.01.2004 | |
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | MC | 31.01.2004 | |
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | GR | 05.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US4279655 (GARVIE RONALD C, et al) [YD] 1-3,8,9,11 * abstract * * claims 1,2 *; | [YA]EP0232095 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-3,8,9,11,15-21 * abstract * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 12 - line 22 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 2 - line 7 * * page 7, line 5 - line 8 * * page 21, line 4 - line 9 * * example 23; table 1 * * claim - * [A] 4-7,10,12-14; | [Y]US4748138 (WATANABE MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,8,9,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - line 63 * * column 3, line 62 - line 66 * * example 1 * * table 2 *; | [YD]US4885266 (HUGHAN ROBERT R [AU], et al) [YD] 15-21 * abstract ** claims 14-19 * |