EP1175780 - TELEPHONE ADAPTER AND TELEPHONE SYSTEM PROVIDING MULTIPLE TELEPHONE LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKE, Timothy, M. 1811 Waverly Lane Algonquin, IL 60102 / US | 02 /
FULLER, Gregory, W. 401 Prides Run Lake in the Hills, IL 60102 / US | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2002/05] | Litchfield, Laura Marie, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint - Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00912199.7 | 08.03.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000US06029 | Priority number, date | US19990271599 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: US 271599 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056071 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175780 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04Q7/00 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
H04M7/0069 (EP,US);
H04M1/715 (EP,US);
H04M1/725 (EP,US);
H04M3/005 (EP,US);
H04M3/42323 (EP,US);
H04M3/46 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE [2004/20] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEFONADAPTER UND TELEFONSYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON MEHREREN TELEFONLEITUNGEN | [2002/05] | English: | TELEPHONE ADAPTER AND TELEPHONE SYSTEM PROVIDING MULTIPLE TELEPHONE LINES | [2002/05] | French: | ADAPTATEUR TELEPHONIQUE ET SYSTEME TELEPHONIQUE GERANT PLUSIEURS LIGNES | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 19.10.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5200994 (SASANO JUN [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 7, lines 9-37; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - WARING D L ET AL, "A newly emerging customer premises paradigm for delivery of network-based services", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990225), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 411 - 424, XP004304491 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(98)00268-2 | International search | [X]US4581733 (SARSON GARY A [CA], et al); | [A]US5719872 (DUBBERLY GREGORY THOMAS [US], et al); | [Y]US5748680 (MOBIN MOHAMMAD SHAFIUL [US]); | [A]US5818825 (CORRIGAN RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US5862451 (GRAU ALAN L [US], et al); | [XP]US5917814 (BALATONI NICHOLAS A [US]); | [AP]US5966636 (CORRIGAN RICHARD [US], et al) |