EP1149173 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE CONCENTRATION OF THROMBIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JenAffin GmbH Winzerlaer Strasse 2 07745 Jena / DE | [2008/20] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states HaemoSys GmbH Winzerlaer Strasse 2a 07745 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOWAK, Götz Ziegesaustrasse 1 D-07747 Jena / DE | 02 /
BUCHA, Elke Kirchberg 9 D-99094 Erfurt / DE | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30 J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/05] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2001/44] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, Dr, et al Albrecht, Lüke & Jungblut Patentanwälte Gelfertstrasse 56 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00912349.8 | 28.01.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000DE00330 | Priority number, date | DE19991004674 | 04.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19904674 | [2001/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0046602 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1149173 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149173 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/56 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER KONZENTRATION VON THROMBININHIBITOREN | [2001/44] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE CONCENTRATION OF THROMBIN INHIBITORS | [2001/44] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA CONCENTRATION D'INHIBITEURS DE THROMBINE | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 17.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2002 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.05.2007 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2008/01] | 01.04.2008 | Resumption of proceedings | [2008/09] | 01.05.2007 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2008/09] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | AT | 28.01.2013 | IE | 28.01.2013 | LU | 28.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/24] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
AT | 28.01.2013 | ||
IE | 28.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 22.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DY]US5547850 (NOWAK GOETZ [DE], et al) [DY] 1-12 * the whole document * * claim - *; | [Y]US5529905 (LANG HARTMUT [AT], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 14 - line 17 * * column 2, line 51 - line 52 * * column 3, line 24 - line 28 *; | [A]EP0570355 (IMMUNO AG [AT]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [X] - HAN JIN-HUA ET AL, "Inhibition of meizothrombin and meizothrombin(desF1) by heparin cofactor II.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19971107), vol. 272, no. 45, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 28660 - 28665, XP002141790 [X] 1-12 * page 28661, column L, line 14 - line 30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.45.28660 | [A] - DOYLE M F ET AL, "MULTIPLE ACTIVE FORMS OF THROMBIN IV. RELATIVE ACTIVITIES OF MEIZOTHROMBINS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 265, no. 18, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 10693 - 10701, XP002141791 [A] 1-12 * page 10695, column R * * abstract * | by applicant | EP0570355 | US5529905 | US5547850 | - DOYLE ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (199006), vol. 265, no. 18, pages 10693 - 10701 | - JIN-HUA, HAN ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (199711), vol. 272, no. 45, pages 28660 - 28665 |