EP1155102 - FUEL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWAHN, Harald Schlo strasse 68 D-69168 Wiesloch / DE | 02 /
POSSELT, Dietmar Ziegelhäuser Landstrasse 7 D-69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/29] |
Former [2001/47] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00912452.0 | 05.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000EP00911 | Priority number, date | DE1999105211 | 09.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19905211 | [2001/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0047698 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155102 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/22, C10L1/18, C10L1/24, C10L10/00, C10L10/04 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
C10L10/08 (EP);
C10L1/22 (KR);
C10L1/143 (EP);
C10L1/19 (EP);
C10L1/1966 (EP);
C10L1/198 (EP);
C10L1/1985 (EP);
C10L1/231 (EP);
C10L1/2364 (EP);
C10L1/238 (EP);
C10L1/2383 (EP);
C10L1/2437 (EP);
C10L1/1616 (EP);
C10L1/1641 (EP);
C10L1/188 (EP);
C10L1/1881 (EP);
C10L1/1905 (EP);
C10L1/191 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 08.08.2001 | LV | 08.08.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 08.08.2001 | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/47] | English: | FUEL COMPOSITION | [2001/47] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CARBURANT | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 12.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/01] | 12.09.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/01] | Appeal following examination | 10.05.2004 | Appeal received No. T0903/04 | 09.07.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.09.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 12.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.09.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP02023972.9 / EP1277828 | EP05019565.0 / EP1612257 | Request for further processing for: | 28.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.12.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2174787 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [X] 1,11,13,14 * page 2; table 1 *; | [A]US4191537 (HONNEN LEWIS R [US], et al) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0307815 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5057122 (BLAIN DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0476485 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 4 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0543225 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0565285 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [Y] 9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9420593 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1,9,11,13,14 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0639632 (OEMV AG [AT]) [DY] 6 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9523836 (ORR WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1,2,11-14 * page 176 - page 177 * * page 192 - page 193 * [Y] 3-9; | [XY]WO9533022 (ORR WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1,2,11-14 * page 165; examples 130,141 * * page 192 - page 194 * [Y] 10; | [DY]DE4425835 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 3 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0704519 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * the whole document * [A] 2,7; | [A]WO9625473 (BP CHEMICALS ADDITIVES [GB], et al) [A] 1,9,14* the whole document *; | [DY]EP0831141 (BP CHEMICALS ADDITIVES [GB]) [DY] 10 * the whole document * |