EP1157176 - Panels with coupling means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/48] | PANEL WITH A SHAPED PLUG-IN SECTION | ||
[2003/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kronospan Technical Company Ltd. 2 Andrea Zakkou Street, Office 102 2404 Engomi Nicosia / CY | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Kronospan Technical Company Ltd. 2 Andrea Zakkou Street, Office 102 2404 Engomi Nicosia / CY | ||
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Kronospan Technical Company 2 Andrea Zakkou Street - Office 102 2404 Engomi, Nikosia / CY | ||
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Kronospan Technical Company Ltd. Iasonos Street Nikosia 1082 / CY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOEBUS, Maik Mühlbacher Str. 1 D-01561 Lampertswalde / DE | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00912485.0 | 18.02.2000 | [2001/48] | WO2000EP01359 | Priority number, date | DE19992022649U | 27.12.1999 Original published format: DE 29922649 U | DE20002001788U | 02.02.2000 Original published format: DE 20001788 U | [2001/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0148332 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157176 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1157176 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/04, E04F13/08 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
E04F15/181 (EP,KR,US);
E04F13/0878 (EP,KR,US);
E04F13/08 (EP,US);
E04F15/02 (EP,US);
E04F15/04 (EP,US);
E04F2201/01 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0107 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0115 (EP,KR,US);
E04F2201/0123 (EP,KR,US);
E04F2201/0153 (EP,KR,US);
E04F2201/022 (EP,KR,US);
E04F2201/023 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Paneele mit Verbindungsmitteln | [2003/17] | English: | Panels with coupling means | [2003/17] | French: | Panneaux avec des moyens d'assemblage | [2003/17] |
Former [2001/48] | PANEEL MIT STECKPROFIL | ||
Former [2001/48] | PANEL WITH A SHAPED PLUG-IN SECTION | ||
Former [2001/48] | PANNEAU A PROFIL DE CONNEXION | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 16.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02005400.3 / EP1215351 | EP02025255.7 / EP1283313 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.10.2003 | FI | 22.10.2003 | IE | 22.10.2003 | DK | 22.01.2004 | GR | 22.01.2004 | SE | 22.01.2004 | LU | 18.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | PT | 22.03.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 22.10.2003 | |
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
LU | 18.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
LU | 18.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
IE | 22.10.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 22.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB2256023 (MAGNET HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,5,9,10,14 * page 4, line 22 - page 8, line 35; figures 1-8 * [A] 2-4; | [XA]DE4242530 (FRIEDL WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,12,13 * column 3, line 47 - column 6, line 36; figures 1-5E * [A] 6; | [DA]WO9627719 (PERSTORP FLOORING AB [SE], et al) [DA] 1,2,4,5,9,16,17 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9966152 (VALINGE ALUMINIUM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,14-16 * page 20, line 23 - page 22, line 30; figures 10-12 *; | [E]FR2785633 (ROY VALERIE [FR]) [E] 1,4,5,7-10,12-14,16 * page 4, line 29 - page 9, line 11 ** page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 36; figures 1-3 * | Examination | DE1212275 | DE3343601 | JPH03169967 | EP0855482 | AT405560B | WO9966151 | WO0028171 | by applicant | WO9627721 | WO9627719 | WO9747834 | EP0698162 | EP0906994 |