EP1183097 - GAS PHASE OLEFIN POLYMERISATION PROCESS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS EUROPE LIMITED Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | For:FR
BP CHEMICALS S.N.C. 8 rue des Gémeaux Cergy St. Christophe 95866 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states INEOS EUROPE LIMITED Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
For:FR
BP Chemicals S.N.C. 8 rue des Gémeaux Cergy St. Christophe, 95866 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Innovene Europe Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | ||
For:FR
BP Chemicals S.N.C. 8 rue des Gémeaux Cergy St. Christophe, 95866 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | ||
For:FR
BP Chemicals S.N.C. 8 rue des Gémeaux Cergy St. Christophe, 95866 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUREL, Jean-Alain Le Villandry I, 122, rue du Commandant Rolland 13008 Marseille / FR | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Preece, Michael, et al Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | [2008/32] |
Former [2006/33] | Preece, Michael, et al COMPASS PATENT LLP Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Preece, Michael Innovene Europe Limited European Patents Group Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
Former [2002/10] | Preece, Michael BP International Limited Patents and Agreements Division Sunbury Research Centre Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 00912772.1 | 23.03.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000GB01098 | Priority number, date | FR19990004688 | 12.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9904688 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0061278 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183097 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183097 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/24, C08F10/00, F28D7/16, F28F9/02 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
F28F9/0263 (EP,US);
B01J8/1809 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
F28D7/16 (EP,US);
F28F9/02 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00274 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/01 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F2/34 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR GASPHASENPOLYMERISATION VON OLEFINEN | [2002/10] | English: | GAS PHASE OLEFIN POLYMERISATION PROCESS AND APPARATUS | [2002/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINE EN PHASE GAZEUSE | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE Borealis Technology OY P.O.Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI Opponent's representative Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE Borealis Technology OY P.O.Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI Opponent's representative Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | 06.11.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.05.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 27.02.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.04.2006 | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.04.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.04.2006 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/34] | 26.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.01.2003 | LI | 02.01.2003 | CY | 23.03.2003 | LU | 23.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | CH | 02.01.2003 | |
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
CY | 23.03.2003 | ||
LU | 23.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | CH | 02.01.2003 | |
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
LU | 23.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 02.01.2003 | |
LI | 02.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE1005993 (OTTO & CO GMBH DR C) [DA] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0042892 (ZINK CO JOHN [US]) [DA] 5 * page 5, line 1 - line 30 ** figure 1 *; | [DA]US4588790 (JENKINS III JOHN M [US], et al) [DA] 1,5 * column 4, line 62 - column 7, line 42 * * column 11, line 12 - line 25 * * figure 1 * |