EP1116692 - METHOD FOR PREPARING LITHIUM MANGANATE, LITHIUM MANGANATE, POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY CELL CONTAINING THE SAME AS ACTIVE MATERIAL AND LITHIUM SECONDARY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOHO TITANIUM CO., LTD. 3-3-5, Chigasaki Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states TOHO TITANIUM CO., LTD. 3-3-5, Chigasaki Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAWAKI, Tetsuya, Toho Titanium Co., Ltd. Chigasaki Plant, 3-3-5, Chigasaki Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa253-8510 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Hideki, Toho Titanium Co., Ltd. Chigasaki Plant, 3-5, Chigasaki 3-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-8510 / JP | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 19 02 17 53037 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 19 02 17 53037 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2001/29] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al HARWARDT NEUMANN, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 14 55 53704 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00912911.5 | 29.03.2000 | [2001/29] | WO2000JP01947 | Priority number, date | JP19990088185 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8818599 | [2001/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0059830 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116692 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C01G45/00, H01M4/50 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
C01G45/1228 (EP,US);
C01G45/1242 (EP,US);
C01P2002/32 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/29] | C01G45/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LITHIUMMANGANAT, LITHIUMMANGANAT, POSITIVE ELEKTRODE FÜR SEKUNDÄRE LITHIUMZELLEN, DIE DIESES ALS AKTIVES MATERIAL ENTHÄLT, UND SEKUNDÄRE LITHIUMZELLE. | [2001/29] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING LITHIUM MANGANATE, LITHIUM MANGANATE, POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY CELL CONTAINING THE SAME AS ACTIVE MATERIAL AND LITHIUM SECONDARY CELL | [2001/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE MANGANATE DE LITHIUM, MANGANATE DE LITHIUM, ELECTRODE POSITIVE POUR CELLULE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM CONTENANT LE MANGANATE DE LITHIUM COMME MATIERE ACTIVE, ET CELLULE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2001 | Translation filed | 17.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 19.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: EURO-PCT translation(s) not filed | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/30] | 02.03.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.01.2001 | 16.01.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   17.01.2001 | 16.01.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.01.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0876997 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 9-11 * table 2 *; | [X]JPH10182161 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [X] 9-11 * table 1 *; | [A]EP0735004 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 26 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 14; figure 1; example 1 * * column 1, line 12 - line 18 *; | [A]JPH09161799 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-5,7,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0903796 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 9-11 * paragraph [0072]; example 6 * | International search | [X]JPH09161799 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]WO9908964 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al); | [X]JPH10182161 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [X]JPH10182157 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [X]JPH10289707 (TOSHIBA BATTERY); | [XP]JPH11180717 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA) |