EP1168187 - METHOD OF SYNCHRONOUS SERIAL COMMUNICATION AND SYSTEM FOR SYNCHRONOUS SERIAL COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Finetech Inc. 5540-11 Sakatemachi Mitsukaido-shi, Ibaraki 303-8503 / JP | [2005/52] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Canon Finetech Inc. 5540-11 Sakatemachi Mitsukaido-shi, Ibaraki 303-8503 / JP | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states COPYER CO., LTD. 3-3, Shimorenjaku 6-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Michitaka Copyer Co., Ltd., 3-3, Shimorenja ku 6-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo 181-8520 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00913041.0 | 31.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000JP02097 | Priority number, date | JP19990094369 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: JP 9436999 | [2002/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0058845 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168187 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1168187 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, H04L25/38, G06F13/42 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
H04L1/0084 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | G06F13/38, H04L25/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR SYNCHRONE SERIELLE KOMMUNIKATION | [2002/01] | English: | METHOD OF SYNCHRONOUS SERIAL COMMUNICATION AND SYSTEM FOR SYNCHRONOUS SERIAL COMMUNICATION | [2002/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION DE SERIE SYNCHRONE ET SYSTEME POUR COMMUNICATION DE SERIE SYNCHRONE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2001 | Translation filed | 25.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2005 | BE | 28.12.2005 | CH | 28.12.2005 | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | IT | 28.12.2005 | LI | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | IE | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
IE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
IE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0367093 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 8,9* abstract *; | [Y]EP0378762 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - line 47 * * column 2, line 18 - line 23 * * column 3, line 5 - line 10 * * column 4, line 4 - line 8 * * column 5, line 2 - line 6 *; | [Y]EP0608492 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 13 *; | [Y]EP0613300 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 2,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 1 * * column 9, line 16 - line 28 *; | [Y]EP0725485 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - line 14 * * page 3, line 31 - line 40 * * page 4, line 4 - line 19 * * page 5, line 29 - line 32 *; | [A]JPH08221224 (CANON KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0040] *; | [A]JPH10289172 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0895400 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0008] * | International search | [Y]JPS5539953 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JPS63254554 (FANUC LTD); | [Y]US5557754 (SONE HIRONAO [JP], et al); | [A]JPH08314847 (HITACHI MAXELL) |