EP1197498 - METHOD OF TREATING POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | ||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Yoshiki 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0872 / JP | 02 /
KITANO, Kenichi 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0872 / JP | 03 /
FUJITA, Nao 2-80, Yoshidacho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0872 / JP | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2004/23] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, avenue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2002/16] | Ulmann, Catherine Claire, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00913085.7 | 03.04.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000JP02158 | Priority number, date | JP19990095656 | 02.04.1999 Original published format: JP 9565699 | [2002/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0059960 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197498 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197498 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08F8/26, C08F8/42 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
C08F8/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON POLYMERHARZ | [2002/16] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING POLYMER | [2002/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE POLYMÈRES | [2005/40] |
Former [2002/16] | PROC D DE TRAITEMENT DE POLYM RES | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2001 | Translation filed | 26.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 01.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 22.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9847931 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0976766 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0845479 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9801480 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]) [Y] 1-26 * claims 1-39 *; | [Y]EP0789036 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0549064 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0343526 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]EP0201371 (POUDRES & EXPLOSIFS STE NALE [FR]) [A] 1 * claims 1-14 * | International search | [X]US4808664 (SAAM JOHN C [US]); | [A]US5807937 (MATYJASZEWSKI KRZYSZTOF [US], et al) |