Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP1146859

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
CY 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
Examination procedure20.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase20.08.2001National basic fee paid 
20.08.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2001Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted24.08.2005
Opposition procedure26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit published on 02.08.2006 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:24.10.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.10.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20010820;SI PAYMENT 20010820
 
Event date:24.10.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010820
 
Event date:20.03.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020204
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:RO SI
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:31.08.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:21.09.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:29.09.2005 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60022163
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20050929
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:30.11.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE
 
Event date:19.12.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:16.03.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2248057 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:19.05.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:02.08.2006 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20060526
 
Event date:13.01.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1037137 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:30.10.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
OWNER:SCHERING CORPORATION
Free Format Text:SCHERING CORPORATION#2000 GALLOPING HILL ROAD KENILWORTH,#NEW JERSEY 07033-0530 (US) -TRANSFER TO- SCHERING CORPORATION#2000 GALLOPING HILL ROAD KENILWORTH,#NEW JERSEY 07033-0530 (US)
 
Event date:11.10.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:13.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Free Format Text:SCHERING CORPORATION#2000 GALLOPING HILL ROAD KENILWORTH,#NEW JERSEY 07033-0530 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.#126 EAST LINCOLN AVENUE#RAHWAY, NEW JERSEY 07065 (US)
 
Event date:03.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL TD
Code Expl.: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS
Effective DATE:20120924
 
Event date:05.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES PC2A
Code Expl.:+TRANSFER OF PATENT
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Effective DATE:20121023
 
Event date:28.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI SP73
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.; US
Effective DATE:20130102
 
Event date:19.04.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
OWNER:SCHERING CORPORATION, US
Effective DATE:20130319
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60022163 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SCHERING CORP., 07033-0530 KENILWORTH, US
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60022163 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:UEXKUELL & STOLBERG, DE
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20121228
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:15.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT HC 302596 AT T
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., US
Effective DATE:20130117
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20131227
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20131230
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20131230
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20131227
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20131230
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.03.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20140211
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20140108
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20140127
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20140102
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20140127
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20140109
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20140117
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20140122
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20131227
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140127
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60022163 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., RAHWAY, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SCHERING CORP., 07033-0530 KENILWORTH, NEW JERSEY, US
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:30.06.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150131
 
Event date:12.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V1
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20150801
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150127
 
Event date:01.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:28.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
Effective DATE:20150131
 
Event date:15.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 302596 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20150127
 
Event date:03.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MM4A
Code Expl.:-ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT
Free Format Text:LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20150727
 
Event date:30.09.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150202
 
Event date:30.09.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150801
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150131
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150727
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150127
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150131
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI KO00
Code Expl.:-LAPSE OF PATENT
Effective DATE:20150909
 
Event date:04.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150128
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150127
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150805
 
Event date:31.12.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150127
 
Event date:30.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150127
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150131
 
Event date:26.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20160226
 
Event date:02.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR ML 20050403163 GR
Code Expl.:-LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20150805
 
Event date:02.12.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20050403163 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150128
 
Event date:03.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60022163 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:UEXKUELL & STOLBERG PARTNERSCHAFT VON PATENT- , DE
Effective DATE:20130516
 
Event date:20.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20181221
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20181227
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20181219
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:27.01.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 60022163 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:19.02.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20200126
 
Event date:01.05.2020 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20200126
 
Event date:08.07.2005 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:25.06.2005 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:13.01.2005 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:07.09.2001 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:30.06.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:30.06.2006 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261