EP1166603 - MICROWAVE HEATING APPARATUS FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHIC COLUMNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MT Systems, LLC 425 Forest Street Denver, CO 80220 / US | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAISFORD, Scott 425 Forest Street Denver, CO 80220 / US | 02 /
WALTERS, David L. 2640 Avocet Road Ft. Collins, Colorado 80526 / US | [2002/12] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
GAISFORD, Scott 425 Forest Street Denver, CO 80220 / US | ||
02 /
WALTERS, David L. Building 7, Suite 105, 11310 Melody Drive Northglenn, CO 80234 / US | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00913399.2 | 08.02.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US03279 | Priority number, date | US19990262230 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: US 262230 | US19990359879 | 23.07.1999 Original published format: US 359879 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052970 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1166603 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/80, H05B6/72, G01N30/02 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H05B6/70 (EP,US);
G01N30/30 (EP,US);
H05B6/6402 (EP,US);
H05B6/705 (EP,US);
H05B6/80 (EP,US);
G01N2030/025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENHEIZVORRICHTUNG FÜR GASCHROMATOGRAPHIEKOLONNE | [2002/01] | English: | MICROWAVE HEATING APPARATUS FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHIC COLUMNS | [2002/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE PAR MICRO-ONDES POUR COLONNES DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN PHASE GAZEUSE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]US4204423 (JORDAN JOHN H [US]) [DX] 1,6,7,10,12-17 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 1-47 * [Y] 2-5,8,9,11; | [Y]JPH0331480 (CANON KK) [Y] 2-5,8,9,11 * abstract ** figures 1a,1b *; | [XY]US5022756 (RHODES ROBERT P [US]) [X] 1,6,7,10,12-17 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 6-45 * [Y] 2-5,8,9,11 | International search | [A]US4204423 (JORDAN JOHN H [US]); | [A]US4339648 (JEAN OLIVIER A L); | [A]US5009099 (WELLS GREGORY J [US], et al); | [A]US5022756 (RHODES ROBERT P [US]); | [A]US5471037 (GOETHEL PETER J [US], et al) | Examination | WO9714957 | by applicant | US19980108297 |