EP1072007 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AN AUTOMATED EXCHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Net Exchange 12625 High Bluff Drive, Suite 316 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Net Exchange 324 E. Whittley, P.O. BOx 1861 Avalon, CA 90704-1009 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLIFNER, Lance, A. 13224 Jacarte San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
ISHIKIDA, Takashi San Diego, CA / US | 03 /
LEDYARD, John San Diego, CA / US | 04 /
POLK, Charles W. 324 E. Whittley, P.O. Box 1861 Avalon, CA 90704-1861 / US | 05 /
JOHNSTON, Wallace, W. Norwell, MA / US | 06 /
HOWIESON, Andrew, W. Duxbury, MA / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 00913442.0 | 11.02.2000 | [2001/05] | WO2000US03594 | Priority number, date | US19990119888P | 12.02.1999 Original published format: US 119888 P | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048109 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072007 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN WECHSEL | [2001/05] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AN AUTOMATED EXCHANGE | [2001/05] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ECHANGE AUTOMATISE | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 03.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/14] | 22.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [XP]WO9931613 ; | [Y]US5689652 ; | [XP]US5873071 ; | [XP]WO9956232 ; | [XE]US6035287 | [X] - FAN M. ET AL., "Creating electronic markets", DR. DOBB'S JOURNAL,, (199811), pages 52 - 56, XP002928103 | [A] - KALKOTA ET AL., "Worldwide real time decision support systems for electronic commerce applications", JOURNAL OF ORGANIZATIONAL COMPUTING AND ELECTRONIC COMMERCE,, (1996), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 11 - 32, XP002928102 |