EP1159372 - MONOCARBOXYLIC ACID BASED ANTIFREEZE COMPOSITION FOR DIESEL ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ashland Licensing and Intellectual Property LLC 5200 Blazer Parkway Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2011/17] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Ashland Inc. 3499 Blazer Parkway Lexington, KY 40509 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURCOTTE, David, E. 4306 Stoneynurst Place Lexington, KY 40514 / US | 02 /
COFFEY, Arnold, L., Jr. Apartment 65, 3650 Tates Creek Road Lexington, KY 40517 / US | 03 /
OLSEN, Alden, W. 3117 Glenwood Drive Lexington, KY 40509 / US | 04 /
DITURO, Michael, A. 4386 Green Valley Road Huntington, WV 25701 / US | 05 /
STEPHENS, Carl, R. 2619 Algonquin Avenue Ashland, KY 41102 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00913616.9 | 25.02.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000US04850 | Priority number, date | US19990121904P | 26.02.1999 Original published format: US 121904 P | WO1999US11324 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: PCT/US99/11324 | US19990422596 | 21.10.1999 Original published format: US 422596 | US20000510880 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: US 510880 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050532 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159372 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159372 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/20 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
C23F11/08 (EP);
C09K5/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FROSTSCHUTZMITTEL FÜR DIESELMOTOREN AUF DER BASIS VON MONOCARBONSÄUREN | [2001/49] | English: | MONOCARBOXYLIC ACID BASED ANTIFREEZE COMPOSITION FOR DIESEL ENGINES | [2001/49] | French: | COMPOSITION ANTIGEL A BASE D'ACIDES MONOCARBOXYLIQUES POUR MOTEURS DIESEL | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 30.03.2011 | [2011/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1950676 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-60* tabel 2, composion no. 11 * | International search | [X]US5269956 (MILLER DAVID L [US], et al); | [Y]US4402847 (WILSON JOE C [US], et al); | [Y]US4725405 (CASSIN THOMAS R [US], et al); | [A]US4728452 (HANSEN GERALD D [US]) | by applicant | US5269956 | US4402847 | US4725405 | US4728452 | DE1950676 |