Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03004623 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2004 | A3 | WO03004623 | 16.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03000865 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2003 | A3 | WO03000865 | 03.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02099085 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2004 | A3 | WO02099085 | 12.12.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02092787 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2003 | A3 | WO02092787 | 21.11.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02077188 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2003 | A3 | WO02077188 | 03.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02077186 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2003 | A3 | WO02077186 | 03.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02077013 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2004 | A3 | WO02077013 | 03.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0183510 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0179480 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2003 | A9 | WO0179480 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0179444 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2002 | A3 | WO0179444 | 25.10.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0179443 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2002 | A3 | WO0179443 | 25.10.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0179442 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2002 | A3 | WO0179442 | 25.10.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0179271 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2002 | A9 | WO0179271 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0179258 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2002 | A9 | WO0179258 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0177137 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2002 | A9 | WO0177137 | 18.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0123598 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0123547 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0123546 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0123409 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2002 | A8 | WO0123409 | 05.04.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0123402 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077256 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077255 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077237 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077197 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077173 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077026 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2001 | A8 | WO0077026 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077023 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077022 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0077021 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0076531 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0076530 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0070076 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17877000 | 28.01.2000 | US13512299 | 19.05.1999 | US14944799 | 18.08.1999 | US13779799 | 03.06.1999 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0063230 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2001 | A3 | WO0063230 | 26.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061779 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061774 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2004 | A3 | WO0061774 | 19.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14702099 | 03.08.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US15293399 | 09.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US13167299 | 29.04.1999 | US13069399 | 23.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061748 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061629 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061628 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061627 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061626 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061625 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061624 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2001 | A8 | WO0061624 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061620 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061614 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | A8 | WO0061614 | 19.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US14282199 | 08.07.1999 | US14944899 | 18.08.1999 | US16475199 | 12.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0061596 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2002 | A8 | WO0061596 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058513 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058496 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058495 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058494 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058469 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058468 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058467 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058358 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2001 | A9 | WO0058358 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058357 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058356 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058355 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058350 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058340 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2004 | A3 | WO0058340 | 05.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058339 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2002 | A3 | WO0058339 | 05.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058336 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058335 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058334 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0057903 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056883 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056882 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056881 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056880 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056767 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056766 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056765 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056755 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056754 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056753 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0056751 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055199 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055198 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055176 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055175 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055171 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018200346 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92760007 | 29.10.2007 | US201715850371 | 21.12.2017 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US201313855454 | 02.04.2013 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9775888 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2014010798 | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US92760207 | 29.10.2007 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US201313855434 | 02.04.2013 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9849162 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2014004095 | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92760007 | 29.10.2007 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US201313855454 | 02.04.2013 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8946156 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2013266553 | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US92760207 | 29.10.2007 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US201213464248 | 04.05.2012 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013203164 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99460804 | 23.11.2004 | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US10529902 | 26.03.2002 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US78166507 | 23.07.2007 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US13654808 | 10.06.2008 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | US75340110 | 02.04.2010 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US201313848789 | 22.03.2013 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013102533 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93210404 | 02.09.2004 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US201213612636 | 12.09.2012 | US17115408 | 10.07.2008 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | US83311801 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013029911 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93210404 | 02.09.2004 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US17115408 | 10.07.2008 | US201213612646 | 12.09.2012 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | US83311801 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012252732 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92761007 | 29.10.2007 | US201113212879 | 18.08.2011 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9821039 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2017 | B2 | US2012141449 | 07.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92760007 | 29.10.2007 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012141415 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US92758307 | 29.10.2007 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012021985 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83311101 | 12.04.2001 | US92749207 | 29.10.2007 | US201113152677 | 03.06.2011 | US93352304 | 03.09.2004 | US78434510 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010286048 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57039709 | 30.09.2009 | US54576606 | 11.10.2006 | US26409605 | 02.11.2005 | US83324501 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8410248 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2013 | B2 | US2010255574 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99460804 | 23.11.2004 | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US10529902 | 26.03.2002 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US78166507 | 23.07.2007 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US13654808 | 10.06.2008 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | US75340110 | 02.04.2010 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010249026 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83311101 | 12.04.2001 | US92749207 | 29.10.2007 | US93352304 | 03.09.2004 | US78434510 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011280830 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2011 | A9 | US2010189686 | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7866305 | 14.03.2005 | US36587809 | 04.02.2009 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US83311701 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009105140 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93210404 | 02.09.2004 | US17115408 | 10.07.2008 | US83311801 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009075880 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14022808 | 16.06.2008 | US83304101 | 12.04.2001 | US96745704 | 19.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008269128 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US92761707 | 29.10.2007 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008269127 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92761007 | 29.10.2007 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008269126 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US92760707 | 29.10.2007 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009285816 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2009 | A9 | US2008267962 | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92755507 | 29.10.2007 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008261877 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US92759307 | 29.10.2007 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7785599 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2010 | B2 | US2008131399 | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92967707 | 30.10.2007 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007298491 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99460804 | 23.11.2004 | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US10529902 | 26.03.2002 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US78166507 | 23.07.2007 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007099833 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26409605 | 02.11.2005 | US54576606 | 11.10.2006 | US83324501 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007048818 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US86818404 | 16.06.2004 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US0111988 | 12.04.2001 | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US83324501 | 12.04.2001 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007048297 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99460804 | 23.11.2004 | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US10529902 | 26.03.2002 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007032414 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US47296404 | 30.03.2004 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US0209922 | 26.03.2002 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US0111988 | 12.04.2001 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US83324501 | 12.04.2001 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007031842 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US10529902 | 26.03.2002 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US0209188 | 26.03.2002 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US67018603 | 25.09.2003 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007026454 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US10529902 | 26.03.2002 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US0209257 | 26.03.2002 | US47296504 | 30.06.2004 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US0111988 | 12.04.2001 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US83324501 | 12.04.2001 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7507413 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2009 | B2 | US2007026013 | 01.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83311101 | 12.04.2001 | US93352304 | 03.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007015162 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US10529902 | 26.03.2002 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US67018503 | 25.09.2003 | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US0209239 | 26.03.2002 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006084794 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26409605 | 02.11.2005 | US83324501 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7482013 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2009 | B2 | US2005266533 | 01.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7507414 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2009 | B2 | US2007287173 | 13.12.2007 | A9 | US2005266532 | 01.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7866305 | 14.03.2005 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US83311701 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005244931 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83304101 | 12.04.2001 | US96745704 | 19.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005176061 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47295304 | 10.05.2004 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209105 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005100991 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93210404 | 02.09.2004 | US83311801 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005054051 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92214204 | 20.08.2004 | US83292901 | 12.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10080785 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2018 | B2 | US2008269125 | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US92760207 | 29.10.2007 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US7891405 | 14.03.2005 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014057589 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011217750 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004527205 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004506407 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0111988 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004506402 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003535571 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003535570 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003531590 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US0111850 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003530852 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0111991 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003530847 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112013 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003530846 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0111924 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003530839 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112009 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003530838 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112008 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003530067 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003527829 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003527076 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US14702099 | 03.08.1999 | US0009028 | 06.04.2000 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US15293399 | 09.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US13167299 | 29.04.1999 | US13069399 | 23.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003526333 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003524399 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003523726 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003516114 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003512063 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003512021 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003511008 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003510090 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003510074 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003510062 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003508020 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003508013 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003502062 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003502061 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003502058 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003502057 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003502053 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003502038 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003502031 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003502017 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003501108 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003501011 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003501009 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003501008 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003501007 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003500020 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003500019 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003500018 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003500017 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003500014 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003500012 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002543848 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17877000 | 28.01.2000 | US13512299 | 19.05.1999 | US0013504 | 18.05.2000 | US14944799 | 18.08.1999 | US13779799 | 03.06.1999 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002543772 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002543770 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0009534 | 06.04.2000 | US14282199 | 08.07.1999 | US14944899 | 18.08.1999 | US16475199 | 12.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002543764 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002543763 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002542767 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002542766 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002541833 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002541801 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002541781 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539847 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539843 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539842 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539841 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539832 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539831 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539830 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539816 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539815 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539814 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539811 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539787 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539786 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539785 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539778 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539777 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539776 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539775 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002538811 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002538810 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002538807 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2357008 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP01932549 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2311872 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2298355 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2011 | A3 | EP2298355 | 23.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2295456 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275557 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP01932549 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2267026 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2236152 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2014 | B1 | EP2236152 | 06.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2216409 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2014 | B1 | EP2216409 | 11.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2213743 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP08075327 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2206720 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06015131 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP01937179 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2067488 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1983055 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1832599 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2007 | A3 | EP1832599 | 12.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1803730 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP01937179 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1506398 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2005 | A4 | EP1506398 | 16.02.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209370 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1460900 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2004 | A4 | EP1460900 | 29.09.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209922 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1408759 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2005 | A4 | EP1408759 | 21.04.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209135 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1392817 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2004 | A4 | EP1392817 | 03.03.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209188 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1385381 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2005 | A4 | EP1385381 | 04.02.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209105 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1385380 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2005 | A4 | EP1385380 | 04.02.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209257 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1383888 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2005 | A4 | EP1383888 | 28.01.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US0209239 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1280815 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1278767 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2003 | A4 | EP1278767 | 29.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112009 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1278544 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2004 | A4 | EP1278544 | 29.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112013 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1276856 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2004 | A4 | EP1276856 | 22.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0111991 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1276849 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2004 | A4 | EP1276849 | 22.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US0111850 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1276756 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2004 | A4 | EP1276756 | 22.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0111988 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1274720 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2004 | A4 | EP1274720 | 15.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112008 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1274719 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2004 | A4 | EP1274719 | 15.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0111924 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1248516 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2003 | A4 | EP1248516 | 16.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1224281 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2003 | A4 | EP1224281 | 24.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1220947 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1220942 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1220901 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1220865 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2003 | A4 | EP1220865 | 10.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1198474 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2004 | A4 | EP1198474 | 24.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0009534 | 06.04.2000 | US14282199 | 08.07.1999 | US14944899 | 18.08.1999 | US16475199 | 12.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1192278 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2003 | A4 | EP1192278 | 03.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1192249 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1192176 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2003 | A4 | EP1192176 | 03.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1192171 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2003 | A4 | EP1192171 | 03.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1189917 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2003 | A4 | EP1189917 | 27.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1187931 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2003 | A4 | EP1187931 | 20.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1187908 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2003 | A4 | EP1187908 | 20.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1185700 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1185694 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1185543 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2003 | A4 | EP1185543 | 13.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1185285 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2003 | A4 | EP1185285 | 13.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1185284 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1183386 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2003 | A4 | EP1183386 | 06.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17877000 | 28.01.2000 | US13512299 | 19.05.1999 | US0013504 | 18.05.2000 | US14944799 | 18.08.1999 | US13779799 | 03.06.1999 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1183272 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1181303 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2003 | A4 | EP1181303 | 27.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1177214 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2003 | A4 | EP1177214 | 06.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175503 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175440 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175439 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2002 | A4 | EP1175439 | 30.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1173479 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2002 | A4 | EP1173479 | 23.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1173478 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2003 | A4 | EP1173478 | 23.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1173477 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2003 | A4 | EP1173477 | 23.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1173462 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1173461 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2003 | A4 | EP1173461 | 23.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171626 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2002 | A4 | EP1171626 | 16.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171591 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171590 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171585 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171462 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171460 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2002 | A4 | EP1171460 | 16.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171458 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2003 | A4 | EP1171458 | 16.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171457 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1171456 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2002 | A4 | EP1171456 | 16.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1169440 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2004 | A4 | EP1169440 | 09.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1169346 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2003 | A4 | EP1169346 | 09.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1169344 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1169334 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2003 | A4 | EP1169334 | 09.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1169333 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1169332 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2003 | A4 | EP1169332 | 09.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1169331 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165828 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2002 | A4 | EP1165828 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165827 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2003 | A4 | EP1165827 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165785 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2003 | A4 | EP1165785 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165783 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2002 | A4 | EP1165783 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165606 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2003 | A4 | EP1165606 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165602 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2002 | A4 | EP1165602 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165591 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2002 | A4 | EP1165591 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165590 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2003 | A4 | EP1165590 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165587 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2003 | A4 | EP1165587 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165123 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2002 | A4 | EP1165123 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1163332 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1163331 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1163267 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1163255 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1161448 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1161447 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1161446 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1159287 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2003 | A4 | EP1159287 | 05.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7986300 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7833000 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7714400 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7714000 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7713900 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7480901 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112013 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6745700 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6655701 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0111988 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6456301 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US0111850 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6294201 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0111991 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6102401 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112009 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5906601 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112008 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5906301 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0111924 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5591200 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5566801 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5457000 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5308300 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5308200 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5307000 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5306900 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5177100 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5177000 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5174600 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5174500 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5174300 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5022200 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17877000 | 28.01.2000 | US13512299 | 19.05.1999 | US0013504 | 18.05.2000 | US14944799 | 18.08.1999 | US13779799 | 03.06.1999 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4451300 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4331200 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4200900 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4174600 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17240799 | 17.12.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4174500 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4081000 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0009534 | 06.04.2000 | US14282199 | 08.07.1999 | US14944899 | 18.08.1999 | US16475199 | 12.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4074500 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4074400 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4074300 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4073600 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US14702099 | 03.08.1999 | US0009028 | 06.04.2000 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US15293399 | 09.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US13167299 | 29.04.1999 | US13069399 | 23.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4072300 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4072200 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4072100 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4023200 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4018100 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4011100 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3933300 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3913200 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3913100 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3908700 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3908600 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3885800 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3885700 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3885400 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3885300 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3871300 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3769700 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3767300 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3767000 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3766900 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3766800 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3765500 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3748400 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3747000 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3730500 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3632900 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3632700 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3632500 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3628700 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3628600 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3530100 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3529000 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3518500 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3518200 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3518100 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3518000 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3517000 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3396600 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3249400 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3249300 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002341538 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209922 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002329172 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209105 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002321999 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209135 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002316031 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209257 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002309513 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209188 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002258622 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209370 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002255918 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US0209239 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1161553 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE2016C059I | 20.08.2020 | I2 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2361277 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2363019 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2363022 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2363716 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2364209 | 26.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2364549 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2364630 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2364635 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2364637 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2364650 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365223 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365238 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365247 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365522 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365905 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365917 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14702099 | 03.08.1999 | US0009028 | 06.04.2000 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US15293399 | 09.09.1999 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US13167299 | 29.04.1999 | US13069399 | 23.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365918 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2366132 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2366208 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2366267 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2366691 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US16998099 | 10.12.1999 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2367620 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368210 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US16866299 | 03.12.1999 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US12536099 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368223 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368229 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368281 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368302 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368374 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368376 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368442 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368467 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368469 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368482 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368489 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368700 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368719 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368881 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368909 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17485300 | 07.01.2000 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US12650999 | 26.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368916 | 28.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368927 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650499 | 26.03.1999 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US17484700 | 07.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2368951 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2369458 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2370112 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0009534 | 06.04.2000 | US14282199 | 08.07.1999 | US14944899 | 18.08.1999 | US16475199 | 12.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2370189 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2370441 | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2370489 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2370523 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2370562 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2370767 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2371172 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2371223 | 19.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2373616 | 23.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17877000 | 28.01.2000 | US13512299 | 19.05.1999 | US0013504 | 18.05.2000 | US14944799 | 18.08.1999 | US13779799 | 03.06.1999 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2382185 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2382735 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2382743 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2382748 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2382769 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2383041 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2383048 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2384584 | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US0026371 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2384659 | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2384662 | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US0026324 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2385169 | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0026376 | 26.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2385884 | 05.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2387696 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2390946 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2391361 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2391364 | 21.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2403901 | 08.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2405525 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112009 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2405550 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US0111850 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2405557 | 24.09.2013 | C | CA2405557 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112013 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2405563 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0111991 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2405701 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US0112008 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2405709 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0111924 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2405912 | 18.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0111988 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2441413 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US0209239 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2442710 | 03.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209105 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2442741 | 16.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209922 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2442743 | 12.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209135 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2442777 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209188 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2442797 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209370 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2442816 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209257 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2747325 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | CA2405525 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2216409T | 05.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2236152T | 07.07.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2484966T | 12.08.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2529300T | 18.02.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR16C0043I | 10.04.2020 | I2 | FR16C0043I | 09.12.2016 | I1 | Priority number | Date | EP01934875 | 12.04.2001 | EP06076852 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | EP08075909 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6743613 | 01.06.2004 | B2 | US2002143170 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14702099 | 03.08.1999 | US0009028 | 06.04.2000 | US15293399 | 09.09.1999 | US6742202 | 07.02.2002 | US68589900 | 11.10.2000 | US13167299 | 29.04.1999 | US13069399 | 23.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003036646 | 20.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68589700 | 11.10.2000 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US0009534 | 06.04.2000 | US14282199 | 08.07.1999 | US11625502 | 05.04.2002 | US14944899 | 18.08.1999 | US16475199 | 12.11.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003050466 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17877000 | 28.01.2000 | US70793600 | 08.11.2000 | US13512299 | 19.05.1999 | US0013504 | 18.05.2000 | US14944799 | 18.08.1999 | US10319602 | 22.03.2002 | US13779799 | 03.06.1999 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6994857 | 07.02.2006 | B2 | US2003125247 | 03.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83304101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003171267 | 11.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US83311701 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003199043 | 23.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US83250101 | 12.04.2001 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6905688 | 14.06.2005 | B2 | US2003219875 | 27.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US83311801 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004010134 | 15.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US83324501 | 12.04.2001 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6926898 | 09.08.2005 | B2 | US2004171123 | 02.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83292901 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7368527 | 06.05.2008 | B2 | US2007032413 | 08.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0009067 | 06.04.2000 | US16706199 | 23.11.1999 | US0009068 | 06.04.2000 | US0007440 | 22.03.2000 | US0009069 | 06.04.2000 | US0009066 | 06.04.2000 | US12409599 | 12.03.1999 | US21214200 | 16.06.2000 | US13862699 | 11.06.1999 | US13857399 | 11.06.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | US10529902 | 26.03.2002 | US15580699 | 27.09.1999 | US16994699 | 10.12.1999 | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US16866499 | 03.12.1999 | US0014933 | 01.06.2000 | US0014934 | 01.06.2000 | US16698999 | 23.11.1999 | US0007726 | 23.03.2000 | US12660299 | 26.03.1999 | US0007725 | 23.03.2000 | US0007724 | 23.03.2000 | US17692900 | 20.01.2000 | US0007723 | 23.03.2000 | US0007722 | 23.03.2000 | US12870099 | 09.04.1999 | US0007578 | 23.03.2000 | US17485100 | 07.01.2000 | US12650599 | 26.03.1999 | US12650199 | 26.03.1999 | US13863399 | 11.06.1999 | US17155199 | 22.12.1999 | US0009070 | 06.04.2000 | US12536299 | 19.03.1999 | US0009071 | 06.04.2000 | US17241099 | 17.12.1999 | US17606300 | 14.01.2000 | US12535999 | 19.03.1999 | US20119400 | 02.05.2000 | US12869799 | 09.04.1999 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | US16991699 | 10.12.1999 | US12659699 | 26.03.1999 | US0007579 | 23.03.2000 | US0006765 | 16.03.2000 | US0006059 | 09.03.2000 | US0006058 | 09.03.2000 | US16962399 | 08.12.1999 | US17692600 | 20.01.2000 | US0006057 | 09.03.2000 | US0007661 | 23.03.2000 | US12651199 | 26.03.1999 | US13862599 | 11.06.1999 | US13859999 | 11.06.1999 | US13862999 | 11.06.1999 | US17606800 | 14.01.2000 | US13857299 | 11.06.1999 | US15580799 | 27.09.1999 | US17605200 | 14.01.2000 | US13863299 | 11.06.1999 | US16866599 | 03.12.1999 | US17240899 | 17.12.1999 | US17150499 | 22.12.1999 | US0007677 | 23.03.2000 | US0026337 | 26.09.2000 | US17487100 | 07.01.2000 | US12870399 | 09.04.1999 | US17485200 | 07.01.2000 | US16961699 | 08.12.1999 | US12536399 | 19.03.1999 | US17693000 | 20.01.2000 | US17155099 | 22.12.1999 | US17705000 | 20.01.2000 | US12650899 | 26.03.1999 | US12605499 | 23.03.1999 | US17606400 | 14.01.2000 | US12869699 | 09.04.1999 | US12414299 | 12.03.1999 | US0014926 | 01.06.2000 | US0014928 | 01.06.2000 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | US0014929 | 01.06.2000 | US12659599 | 26.03.1999 | US17154999 | 22.12.1999 | US0006830 | 16.03.2000 | US0026323 | 26.09.2000 | US0006792 | 16.03.2000 | US12409399 | 12.03.1999 | US12414699 | 12.03.1999 | US0006791 | 16.03.2000 | US0007483 | 22.03.2000 | US13859899 | 11.06.1999 | US17606900 | 14.01.2000 | US13862899 | 11.06.1999 | US15580899 | 27.09.1999 | US0014973 | 01.06.2000 | US15580499 | 27.09.1999 | US16866699 | 03.12.1999 | US13863199 | 11.06.1999 | US17240999 | 17.12.1999 | US12660099 | 26.03.1999 | US0007527 | 22.03.2000 | US0007526 | 22.03.2000 | US16990699 | 10.12.1999 | US0007525 | 22.03.2000 | US0006049 | 09.03.2000 | US0007534 | 22.03.2000 | US17487200 | 07.01.2000 | US0008983 | 06.04.2000 | US17241299 | 17.12.1999 | US12650799 | 26.03.1999 | US12870299 | 09.04.1999 | US0008980 | 06.04.2000 | US12650399 | 26.03.1999 | US0006044 | 09.03.2000 | US0006043 | 09.03.2000 | US0008981 | 06.04.2000 | US0006042 | 09.03.2000 | US0008982 | 06.04.2000 | US17693100 | 20.01.2000 | US16961799 | 08.12.1999 | US12536499 | 19.03.1999 | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US12869599 | 09.04.1999 | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US16991099 | 10.12.1999 | US12581299 | 23.03.1999 | US12869999 | 09.04.1999 | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 | US12659499 | 26.03.1999 | US12651099 | 26.03.1999 | US12659899 | 26.03.1999 | US12605199 | 23.03.1999 | US0007535 | 22.03.2000 | US0006014 | 09.03.2000 | US0006013 | 09.03.2000 | US0006012 | 09.03.2000 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | US13857499 | 11.06.1999 | US13862799 | 11.06.1999 | US13859799 | 11.06.1999 | US16866799 | 03.12.1999 | US15580599 | 27.09.1999 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US13863099 | 11.06.1999 | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US0007507 | 22.03.2000 | US0113318 | 26.04.2001 | US12660199 | 26.03.1999 | US0007506 | 22.03.2000 | US0007505 | 22.03.2000 | US12650699 | 26.03.1999 | US12870199 | 09.04.1999 | US17485000 | 07.01.2000 | US17241399 | 17.12.1999 | US0006782 | 16.03.2000 | US12650299 | 26.03.1999 | US0006781 | 16.03.2000 | US17716600 | 20.01.2000 | US17155299 | 22.12.1999 | US15437399 | 17.09.1999 | US12536199 | 19.03.1999 | US0015135 | 01.06.2000 | US17487700 | 07.01.2000 | US0015137 | 01.06.2000 | US12869499 | 09.04.1999 | US0015136 | 01.06.2000 | US0014963 | 01.06.2000 | US0014964 | 01.06.2000 | US12869899 | 09.04.1999 | US12535899 | 19.03.1999 | US0006828 | 16.03.2000 | US12414499 | 12.03.1999 | US12581599 | 23.03.1999 | US0006824 | 16.03.2000 | US12659799 | 26.03.1999 | US0006823 | 16.03.2000 | US17704900 | 20.01.2000 | US0006822 | 16.03.2000 | US16993699 | 10.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007042361 | 22.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95008301 | 12.09.2001 | US27865001 | 27.03.2001 | US0209370 | 26.03.2002 | US47296302 | 26.03.2002 | US95008201 | 12.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6946134 | 20.09.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US83311101 | 12.04.2001 | US19938400 | 25.04.2000 | US22935800 | 12.04.2000 | US25693100 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055352 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16866199 | 03.12.1999 | US12409999 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055201 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16862299 | 03.12.1999 | US12409699 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055200 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16866399 | 03.12.1999 | US12414399 | 12.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055177 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16865499 | 03.12.1999 | US12414599 | 12.03.1999 |