EP1161553 - 50 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Human Genome Sciences, Inc. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSEN, Craig, A. 22400 Rolling Hill Road Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | 02 /
RUBEN, Steven, M. 18528 Heritage Hills Drive Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | 03 /
KOMATSOULIS, George 9518 Garwood Street Silver Spring, MD 20901 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00913811.6 | 09.03.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000US06044 | Priority number, date | US19990124099P | 12.03.1999 Original published format: US 124099 P | US19990168661P | 03.12.1999 Original published format: US 168661 P | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055352 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161553 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/04, C12N15/00, C07H21/02 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 50 HUMANE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE | [2001/50] | English: | 50 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS | [2001/50] | French: | PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES (50) | [2001/50] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 05.05.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |