EP1169214 - COMBINED BRAKING AND CURRENT GENERATING DEVICE FOR BICYCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kläui, Werner Wydenstrasse 8 8575 Bürglen / CH | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | patentanwälte breiter + wiedmer ag Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | patentanwälte breiter + wiedmer ag Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00914000.5 | 05.04.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000CH00200 | Priority number, date | DE1999115186 | 05.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19915186 | [2002/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0059769 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1169214 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1169214 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62J6/06 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
B62J6/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE BREMS- UND STROMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRRÄDER | [2002/02] | English: | COMBINED BRAKING AND CURRENT GENERATING DEVICE FOR BICYCLES | [2002/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF MIXTE DE FREINAGE ET DE GENERATION DE COURANT DESTINE A DES BICYCLETTES | [2002/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 10.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2002 | 30.04.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.10.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.12.2003 | FI | 17.12.2003 | FR | 17.12.2003 | GB | 17.12.2003 | IE | 17.12.2003 | IT | 17.12.2003 | NL | 17.12.2003 | DK | 17.03.2004 | GR | 17.03.2004 | SE | 17.03.2004 | ES | 28.03.2004 | AT | 05.04.2004 | LU | 05.04.2004 | BE | 30.04.2004 | CH | 30.04.2004 | LI | 30.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | PT | 17.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 17.12.2003 | |
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
FR | 17.12.2003 | ||
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
IT | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
AT | 05.04.2004 | ||
LU | 05.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 17.12.2003 | |
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
FR | 17.12.2003 | ||
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
AT | 05.04.2004 | ||
LU | 05.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
FR | 17.12.2003 | ||
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
AT | 05.04.2004 | ||
LU | 05.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
AT | 05.04.2004 | ||
LU | 05.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
LU | 05.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
LU | 05.04.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2004 | ||
LI | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 28.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
GB | 17.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
IE | 17.12.2003 | ||
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
NL | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 17.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2293354 (SOCOMEL CONST MAT ELECTRO [FR]) [A] 1,13 * figures 5-8 *; | [YD]BE906142 (BATT JOHN FRANCIS) [YD] 1,13 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]FR2653612 (LOYSEAU DE GRAND MAISON GUY) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A]US5590946 (JUNG RUEY-FENG [TW]) [A] 1,13* column A; figure 1 *; | [YD]DE29822343U (MERLAKU KASTRIOT [DE]) [YD] 1,13 * figures 2-4 * | by applicant | BE906142 | DE29822343U |