EP1173970 - CALL CHARGES IN A TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDSTRÖM, Johan Strogärdsgatan 5 FIN-21600 Pargas / FI | 02 /
HALKOSAARI, Matti Murkionkatu 3 B 29 20740 Turku / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2002/04] | 01 /
LUNDSTRÖM, Johan Strogärdsgatan 5 FIN-21600 Pargas / FI | ||
02 /
HALKOSAARI, Matti Vanha Hameentie, 114 A 15 FIN-20540 Turku / FI | Representative(s) | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00914125.0 | 10.03.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000EP02190 | Priority number, date | GB19990009865 | 29.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9909865 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0067459 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1173970 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173970 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
H04M15/8044 (EP,US);
H04M15/28 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US);
H04M2215/42 (EP,US);
H04M2215/745 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANRUFGEBÜHREN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZERK | [2002/04] | English: | CALL CHARGES IN A TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2002/04] | French: | TAXATION D'APPELS DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Request for further processing for: | 11.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | BE | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | FR | 02.08.2006 | IT | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | ES | 13.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | LU | 10.03.2007 | IE | 12.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/01] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
FR | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
LI | 02.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9428670 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,2,4,9-12* page 9, line 25 - page 14, line 35 *; | [XY]EP0751662 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10-12 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 3 * * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 21; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,9; | [Y]WO9852344 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 4,9 * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 2 *; | [X]WO9859504 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,9-12 * page 7, line 20 - line 19; figure 4 *; | [E]WO0018104 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [E] 1,2,4,9-12 * page 9, line 5 - page 11, line 37; claim 6 * |