EP1082699 - METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A LINE OF PICK AND PLACE MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Assembléon N.V. Building BAF, Hurksestraat 19 5652 AH Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states Assembleon N.V. Building BAF, Hurksestraat 19 5652 AH Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESHELMAN, Larry, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SCHAFFER, James, D. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Deguelle, Wilhelmus H. G., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Deguelle, Wilhelmus Hendrikus Gerardus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/11] | de Haas, Laurens Johan INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 00914165.6 | 21.03.2000 | [2001/11] | WO2000EP02585 | Priority number, date | US19990286026 | 05.04.1999 Original published format: US 286026 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0060539 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082699 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/12, G06F17/60, H05K13/08 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
G06N3/126 (EP,US);
H05K13/085 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2004/20] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINER REIHE VON BESTÜCKUNGSAUTOMATEN | [2001/11] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A LINE OF PICK AND PLACE MACHINES | [2001/11] | French: | PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION D'UNE LIGNE DE PRENEURS-PLACEURS | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 02.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5819244 (SMITH BRIAN L [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 5 *; | [A] - SCHAFFER J D ET AL, "Balancing SMD assembly lines with genetic algorithms", PROCEEDINGS OF THE JAPAN-USA SYMPOSIUM ON FLEXIBLE AUTOMATION - 1996, PROCEEDINGS OF 1996 JAPAN-USA SYMPOSIUM ON FLEXIBLE AUTOMATION, BOSTON, MA, USA, 7-10 JULY 1996, 1996, New York, NY, USA, ASME, USA, ISBN 0-7918-1231-6, pages 1547 - 1552 vol.2, XP000923451 [A] 1-16 * page 1547, column L, line 1 - page 1552, column R, line 2; figures 1-5 * | [A] - UCKUN S ET AL, "MANAGING GENETIC SEARCH IN JOB SHOP SCHEDULING", IEEE EXPERT,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19931001), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 0885-9000, pages 15 - 24, XP000413469 [A] 1-16 * page 15, column L, line 1 - page 20, column R, line 8; figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/64.236477 | [A] - HOU E S H ET AL, "TASK SCHEDULING FOR FLEXIBLE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS BASED ON GENETIC ALGORITHMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19911013), vol. _, ISBN 0-7803-0233-8, pages 397 - 402, XP000238710 [A] 1-16 * page 397, column L, line 1 - page 400, column R, line 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.1991.169717 | [A] - HAEMAELAEINEN T ET AL, "ACCELERATING GENETIC ALGORITHM COMPUTATION IN TREE SHAPED PARALLEL COMPUTER", JOURNAL OF SYSTEMS ARCHITECTURE,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, (19960801), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 1383-7621, pages 19 - 36, XP000626208 [A] 1 * page 21, column L, line 31 - page 23, column R, line 14; figures 2-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1383-7621(96)00009-4 |