EP1187802 - LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolic AG Chamerstrasse 50 6301 Zug / CH | [2002/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERKAOUI, Zoubair, Mohammed Allmendstrasse 2 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
BENECKE, Carsten Vierthauen 9 D-79576 Weil Am Rhein / DE | 03 /
SCHMITT, Klaus Gartenstrasse 16B D-79541 Lörrach / DE | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Veenstra, Eva, et al Rolic Technologies Ltd. Patent Department Gewerbestrasse 18 4123 Allschwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Veenstra, Eva, et al Rolic Technologies Ltd. Patent Department Gewerbestrasse 18 4123 Allschwil / CH | ||
Former [2002/12] | Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00914329.8 | 11.04.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000IB00448 | Priority number, date | GB19990008934 | 19.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9908934 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0063154 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1187802 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1187802 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/92, C09K19/20, C09K19/32, C07C69/54, C07C69/734, C07C255/54 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
C07C69/54 (EP,US);
C07C255/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07C69/734 (EP,US);
C07C69/92 (EP,US);
C09K19/2014 (EP,US);
C09K19/322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLVERBINDUNGEN | [2002/12] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOUNDS | [2002/12] | French: | COMPOSES DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 10.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2008 | BE | 02.01.2008 | CH | 02.01.2008 | CY | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | IT | 02.01.2008 | LI | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | IE | 11.04.2008 | LU | 11.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
LU | 11.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 02.01.2008 | |
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9522586 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO9700600 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-16 * examples 1-14 *; | [Y]EP0869112 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-16* examples 1-4 *; | [YD]WO9852905 (ROLIC AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | WO0048985 | WO0055110 |