EP1159781 - GENERAL SELF-DRIVEN SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFICATION SCHEME FOR SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFIERS HAVING A FLOATING GATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Ericsson, Inc. 1010 E. Arapaho Road , MS F-11 Richardson, TX 75081 / US | ||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Ericsson, Inc. 1010 E. Arapaho Road , MS F-11 Richardson, TX 75081 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRINGTON, Richard, W. 101 Skyline Cr. Heath, TX 75087 / US | 02 /
HART, William 7700 Ludwig Castle Way Plano, TX 75025 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00914709.1 | 24.02.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000US04872 | Priority number, date | US19990267155 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: US 267155 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054398 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159781 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159781 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
H02M1/38 (EP,US);
H02M3/28 (KR);
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Title | German: | ALLGEMEINES SELBSTGESTEUERTES SYNCHRONGLEICHRICHTUNGSSCHEMA FÜR SYNCHRONGLEICHRICHTER MIT EINEM SCHWEBENDEN GATE | [2001/49] | English: | GENERAL SELF-DRIVEN SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFICATION SCHEME FOR SYNCHRONOUS RECTIFIERS HAVING A FLOATING GATE | [2001/49] | French: | SCHEMA GENERAL DE REDRESSEMENT SYNCHRONE AUTONOME POUR REDRESSEURS SYNCHRONES AYANT UNE GRILLE FLOTTANTE | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.2010 | BE | 17.11.2010 | CY | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | IT | 17.11.2010 | NL | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | GR | 18.02.2011 | IE | 24.02.2011 | LU | 24.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/08] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IE | 24.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3727170 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,21,24 * figure 3 * [Y] 3,4,25; | [Y]EP0529180 (ALCATEL BELL SDT SA [BE]) [Y] 3,4,25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0665634 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-30* abstract *; | [A]EP0868014 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]) [A] 6,26 * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 23; figures 2,3 * |