|
21.09.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.09.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.07.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.07.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.07.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.07.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.03.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.10.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.10.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.09.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.09.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
25 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |