EP1166351 - COMPENSATION MODEL AND REGISTRATION SIMULATOR APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OF PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isola Laminate Systems Corporation 230 North Front Street LaCrosse, WI 54601 / US | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCQUARRIE, W., Gray 6726 E. Villory Pheonix, AZ 85215 / US | 02 /
JONES, Bradley, A. 201 Oak Island Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | [2002/13] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
MCQUARRIE, W., Gray 6726 W. Villeroy Circle Pheonix, AZ 85215 / US | ||
02 /
JONES, Bradley, A. 201 Oak Island Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner, Bernhard Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Wagner, Bernhard Peter ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00914735.6 | 25.02.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US05001 | Priority number, date | US19990270303 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: US 270303 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0055907 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1166351 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/00 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H05K3/4638 (EP,US);
H05K3/00 (KR);
H05K3/0005 (EP,US);
H05K2203/166 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | KOMPENSATIONSMODELL UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGISTERSIMULATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER GEDRUCKTEN LEITERPLATTE | [2002/01] | English: | COMPENSATION MODEL AND REGISTRATION SIMULATOR APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OF PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS | [2002/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MODELISATION DE COMPENSATION ET DE SIMULATION D'ENREGISTREMENT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARTES A CIRCUIT IMPRIME | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/42] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5196087 (KERNS ROBERT Q [US]) [A] 1-5,11,14-17 * claim - * | [X] - E. KELLEY ET AL., "Multilayer Printed Circuits with Exacting Registration Requirements, Achieving Next Generation Design Capabilities", PROCEEDINGS OF IPC PRINTED CIRCUITS EXPO '98, LONG BEACH, CA, USA, 26-30 APRIL 1998, Northbrook, IL, USA, Inst. Interconnecting & Packaging Electron. Circuits, (1998), pages (S16-3-)1 - 17, XP000956161 [X] 1-23 * the whole document * | [X] - R. R. HOLMES ET AL., "Statistical Model for Internal Registration Yield", PROCEEDINGS OF IPC TECHWORKS '96, NAPLES, FL, USA, 19-25 OCTOBER 1996, Northbrook, IL, USA, Inst. Interconnecting & Packaging Electron. Circuits, (1996), pages (F15-)1 - 9, XP000956134 [X] 1-4,7,9,10,14,15,18-23 * the whole document * | [X] - J. P. WILEY, "Registration Control for Multilayer Circuit Boards", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., IBM CORP. NEW YORK., US, (197903), vol. 21, no. 10, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 3976 - 3978, XP002151094 [X] 1-4,9,11,14-16,18-20,22 * the whole document * |