EP1161433 - TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILODEAU, Mark, T. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
FRALEY, Mark, E. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
HUNGATE, Randall, W. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2001/50] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00914843.8 | 08.03.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000US05903 | Priority number, date | US19990123902P | 11.03.1999 Original published format: US 123902 P | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053605 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161433 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P9/10, A61P17/00, A61P17/06, A61P19/02, A61P19/08, A61P27/02, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/535 (EP,US);
A61K41/0038 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/50] | C07D487/04, A61K31/519 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Extension states | AL | 11.10.2001 | LT | 11.10.2001 | LV | 11.10.2001 | MK | 11.10.2001 | RO | 11.10.2001 | SI | 11.10.2001 | Title | German: | TYROSIN-KINASE-INHIBITOREN | [2001/50] | English: | TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS | [2001/50] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE TYROSINE KINASE | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 21.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 06.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9854093 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO9429295 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [A]US5843951 (INOUE MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [AP]US5985882 (INOUE MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [A]US4482555 (DORIA GIANFEDERICO [IT], et al) |