Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
13.07.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.05.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.03.2005 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
11.03.2005 | Change - classification | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] |
09.04.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.04.2003 | Renewal fee | |
13.04.2002 | Renewal fee | |
16.11.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
16.11.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
16.10.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.10.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.10.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.12.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.09.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.09.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.05.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication |