EP1165767 - DNA BINDING PROTEINS THAT INTERACT WITH NPR1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states Duke University Erwin Road Durham, NC 27708-0300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
For all designated states DUKE UNIVERSITY Erwin Road Durham, NC 27708-0300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yuelin Apartment 201, 808 F. Street Davis, CA 95616 / US | 02 /
KINKEMA, Mark 4600 University Drive 713 Durham, NC 27707 / US | 03 /
DONG, Xinnian 3619 Dover Road Durham, NC 27707 / US | 04 /
RONALD, Pamela 26951 Road 96 Davis, CA 95616 / US | 05 /
CHERN, Maw, Shenq 878 Adams Street Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00914926.1 | 10.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US06363 | Priority number, date | US19990267031 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: US 267031 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053741 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165767 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N15/29, C12N15/62, C12N15/63, C12N15/82, A01H5/00, C07K14/415, C12N15/11 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C12N15/8279 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | C12N15/09, C12N15/29, C12N15/62, C12N15/63, C12N15/82, A01H5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Title | German: | DNA-bindende, mit NPR1 interagierende Proteine | [2002/01] | English: | DNA BINDING PROTEINS THAT INTERACT WITH NPR1 | [2002/01] | French: | PROTEINES DE LIAISON D'ADN INTERAGISSANT AVEC NPR1 | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BUTTNER MICHAEL ET AL, "Arabidopsis thaliana ethylene-responsive element binding protein (AtEBP), an ethylene-inducible, GCC box DNA-binding protein interacts with an ocs element binding protein", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1997), vol. 94, no. 11, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5961 - 5966, XP002108953 [X] 12,15-17 * page 5966, column L, paragraph L; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.11.5961 | [X] - DRÖGE-LASER W ET AL, "Rapid stimulation of a soybean protein-serine kinase that phosphorylates a novel bZIP DNA-binding protein, G/HBF-1, during the induction of early transcription-dependent defenses", EMBO JOURNAL, IRL PRESS, EYNSHAM, GB, (19970217), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 726 - 738, XP002200476 [X] 12,15-17 * page 731, column L, paragraph 4 - page 732, column L, paragraph 1; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/16.4.726 | [T] - ZHANG YUELIN ET AL, "Interaction of NPR1 with basic leucine zipper protein transcription factors that bind sequences required for salicylic acid induction of the PR-1 gene", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (19990525), vol. 96, no. 11, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6523 - 6528, XP002320307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.11.6523 | [T] - DESPRES CHARLES ET AL, "The Arabidopsis NPR1/NIM1 protein enhances the DNA binding activity of a subgroup of the TGA family of bZIP transcription factors.", PLANT CELL, (200002), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 279 - 290, XP002320308 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.12.2.279 | [T] - SINGH KARAM B ET AL, "Transcription factors in plant defense and stress responses", CURRENT OPINION IN PLANT BIOLOGY, QUADRANT SUBSCRIPTION SERVICES, GB, (200210), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1369-5266, pages 430 - 436, XP002300503 [T] 1-22 * page 432, column L, paragraph L - page 433, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-5266(02)00289-3 | International search | [Y]US4990607 (KATAGIRI FUMIAKI [US], et al); | [Y]US5623054 (ZHANG HONG [US], et al); | [X] - TABATA ET AL., "HBP-1a and HBP-1b: Leucine Zipper-type transcription factors of wheat", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1991), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 1459 - 1467, XP002930406 | [X] - NIGGEWEG ET AL., "Isolation of TGA2.1, a member of a new subclass of the TGA family of bZIP transcription factors in nicotiana tabacum", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 113, page 1464, XP002930407 | [Y] - CAO ET AL., "Generation of broad-spectrum disease resistance by overexpression of an essential regulatory gene in systemic acquired resistance", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199805), vol. 95, pages 6531 - 6536, XP002930408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.11.6531 | [Y] - MILKAMI ET AL., "The HBP-1 family of wheat basic/leucine zipper proteins interacts with overlapping cis-acting hexamer motifs of plant histone genes", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 269, no. 13, pages 9974 - 9985, XP002930409 | [Y] - RYALS ET AL., "The Arabidopsis NiM1 protein shows homology to the mammalian transcription factor inhibitor IkB", THE PLANT CELL, (199703), vol. 9, pages 425 - 439, XP002930410 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.9.3.425 |