EP1274354 - DEVICE FOR THE ARTICULATED CONNECTION OF TWO BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2006/43] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Synthes AG Chur Grabenstrasse 15 7002 Chur / CH | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states SYNTHES AG Chur Grabenstrasse 15 7002 Chur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLÄPFER, Fridolin Leimen CH-8750 Glarus / CH | 02 /
HESS, Martin Schützenstrasse 2 CH-4434 Hölstein / CH | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Lusuardi, Werther Giovanni, Dr. Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00915082.2 | 19.04.2000 | [2003/03] | WO2000CH00224 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178613 | Date: | 25.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274354 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1274354 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1274354 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/60, A61B17/64, A61B17/80 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/7041 (EP,US);
A61B17/60 (EP,US);
A61B17/7035 (EP,US);
A61B17/7058 (EP,US);
A61B17/8038 (EP,US);
A61B17/8047 (EP,US);
A61B17/6466 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GELENKARTIGEN VERBINDUNG ZWEIER KÖRPER | [2003/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE ARTICULATED CONNECTION OF TWO BODIES | [2003/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT LA CONNEXION ARTICULEE DE DEUX CORPS | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 18.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | PT | 13.03.2007 | LU | 19.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/18] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 27.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5047029 (AEBI MAX [CH], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9400066 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5607426 (RALPH JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0069351 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-68 * figure 3 * | by applicant | WO9400066 |