EP1159425 - DNA SEQUENCE OF A PROTEIN THAT IS SIMILAR TO FKBP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schulz, Burkhard Dresdener Strasse 2 72108 Rottenburg a. Neckar / DE | For all designated states Sympore GmbH Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 40 72770 Reutlingen / DE | [2002/28] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Sympore GmbH Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 40 72770 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulz, Burkhard Dresdener Strasse 2 72108 Rottenburg a. Neckar / DE | [2002/28] |
Former [2001/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Dehmel, Albrecht, Dr. Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte, Müllerstrasse 1 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00915112.7 | 18.02.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000DE00506 | Priority number, date | DE1999107598 | 22.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19907598 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050598 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159425 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N15/05, C07K14/415, C12N15/82, C12N5/10 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
C12N15/8298 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
C12N15/8243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DNA-SEQUENZ EINES FKBP ÄHNLICHEN PROTEINS | [2001/49] | English: | DNA SEQUENCE OF A PROTEIN THAT IS SIMILAR TO FKBP | [2001/49] | French: | SEQUENCE D'ADN D'UNE PROTEINE SEMBLABLE A LA PROTEINE FKBP | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - NAKAMURA Y, "Arabidopsis thaliana genomic DNA, chromosome 3, P1 clone: MIL23", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19981116), XP002140828 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * | [X] - ROUNSLEY ET AL., "F15J23TRB IGF Arabidopsis thaliana genomic clone F15J23, genomic survey sequence", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19980529), XP002140829 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - VITTORIOSO ET AL., "Mutation in the Arabidopsis PASTICCINO1 gene ....", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199805), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 3034 - 3043, XP002140830 [A] 1-7,11-13 * abstract * * page 3035 * | [A] - VUCICH ET AL., "Novel structure of high molecular weight FK506 binding protein from Arabidopsis thaliana", MOL GEN GENET, (1996), vol. 252, pages 510 - 517, XP002140831 [A] 3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004380050258 | [A] - LUAN ET AL., "Molecular characterization of a FKBP-type immunophilin from higher plants", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (199607), vol. 93, pages 6964 - 6969, XP002140832 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 6965 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.14.6964 | [PX] - ALCALA ET AL., "Lycopersicon esculentum", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (20000215), XP002140833 [PX] 1,2 * the whole document * | [PX] - WALBOT V, "Zea mays", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19991113), XP002140834 [PX] 1,2 * the whole document * | [PX] - WALBOT V, "Zea Mays", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19991214), XP002140835 [PX] 1-3 * the whole document * |