Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4499298B | Global Dossier | 07.07.2010 | B2 | JP2002542597 | 10.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE0000507 | 23.02.2000 | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU752685B | Global Dossier | 26.09.2002 | B2 | AU3655000 | 02.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE0000507 | 23.02.2000 | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1088372 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2008 | B1 | EP1088372 | 04.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE0000507 | 23.02.2000 | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50014977D1 | 03.04.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE0000507 | 23.02.2000 | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6361380 | 26.03.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE0000507 | 23.02.2000 | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0064013 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100618294B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2006 | B1 | KR20010052748 | 25.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE387023T | 15.03.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29906651U | 24.08.2000 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2298133T | 16.05.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE29906651 | 15.04.1999 |