EP1088372 - ELECTRICAL PLUG-IN CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/08] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINHAUSER, Uwe Grötzinger Strasse 49 D-70794 Filderstadt / DE | 02 /
FENGER, Stefan Wendelkönig 6 D-71334 Waiblingen / DE | [2001/14] | Application number, filing date | 00915113.5 | 23.02.2000 | [2001/14] | WO2000DE00507 | Priority number, date | DE1999206651U | 15.04.1999 Original published format: DE 29906651 U | [2001/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064013 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088372 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088372 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52, H01R13/436 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H01R13/4362 (EP,US);
H01R13/52 (KR);
H01R13/5219 (EP,US);
H01R13/6272 (EP,US);
H01R13/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDUNG | [2001/14] | English: | ELECTRICAL PLUG-IN CONNECTION | [2001/14] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.02.2008 | DK | 20.02.2008 | FI | 20.02.2008 | IE | 20.02.2008 | NL | 20.02.2008 | AT | 23.02.2008 | LU | 23.02.2008 | BE | 28.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | CH | 29.02.2008 | LI | 29.02.2008 | GR | 21.05.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/28] | CY | 20.02.2008 | |
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
AT | 23.02.2008 | ||
LU | 23.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 20.02.2008 | |
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
AT | 23.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
AT | 23.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | DK | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | DK | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 20.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0352088 (AMP INC [US]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 19 - line 27 ** column 5, line 15 - line 30; figures 1,5A,5B *; | [YA]EP0698945 (N & L ELEKTROTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 14 - line 45; figures 1,2 * [A] 4 |