blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1086277

EP1086277 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROAD JOINT, AND JOINT OBTAINED BY SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL STUP
1bis, rue du Petit Clamart
78140 Vélizy Cedex / FR
[2001/13]
Inventor(s)01 / SEANTIER, Jacky
39, avenue de Plaisance
F-28000 Chartres / FR
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Loisel, Bertrand, et al
Cabinet Plasseraud
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]Loisel, Bertrand, et al
Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date00915290.105.04.2000
[2001/13]
WO2000FR00847
Priority number, dateFR1999000446909.04.1999         Original published format: FR 9904469
[2001/13]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0061872
Date:19.10.2000
Language:FR
[2000/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1086277
Date:28.03.2001
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.10.2000
ClassificationIPC:E01D19/06
[2001/13]
CPC:
E01D19/067 (EP,US); E01D19/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/13]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER FLEXIBLEN FAHRBAHNFUGE UND FUGE HERGESTELLT NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN[2001/13]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROAD JOINT, AND JOINT OBTAINED BY SAID METHOD[2001/13]
French:PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN JOINT DE CHAUSSEE SOUPLE, ET JOINT OBTENU PAR UN TEL PROCEDE[2001/13]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2000National basic fee paid 
08.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/13]
07.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/09]
22.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]FR1380667  (TEROSON ET PROT CHIMIQQUE) [A] 1,11 * figure - *;
 [A]DE1279918  (KRUPP GMBH, et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1318805  (INVERNIZZI L) [A] 1,4,6,7,11,14,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0459061  (SHO BOND CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9624726  (PRISMO LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US5649784  (RICAUD ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6,7,11,14,16 * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 39; figure - *;
 [E]WO9952981  (R C A S A [FR], et al) [E] 1,4,6,7,11,14,15* column W *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.