EP1170004 - PREPARATIONS FOR PERCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc. 408, Tashirodaikan-machi Tosu-shi, Saga 841-0017 / JP | [2010/43] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 408, Tashirodaikan-machi Tosu-shi Saga 841-0017 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURITA, Hisakazu Tsukuba Lab. His. Pharm. Co.Inc. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 02 /
TATEISHI, T., Tsukuba Lab. His. Pharm. Co. Inc. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, T., Tsukuba Lab. His. Pharm. Co. Inc. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 04 /
HIGO, Naruhito, Tsukuba Lab. His. Pharm. Co. Inc. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/02] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00915409.7 | 07.04.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000JP02266 | Priority number, date | JP19990104828 | 13.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10482899 | [2002/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0061120 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1170004 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1170004 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K47/12, A61K47/06 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/7076 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNGEN ZUR PERKUTANEN ABSORPTION | [2002/02] | English: | PREPARATIONS FOR PERCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION | [2002/02] | French: | PREPARATIONS DESTINEES A ETRE ABSORBEES PAR VOIE PERCUTANEE | [2010/14] |
Former [2002/02] | PR PARATIONS DESTIN ES TRE ABSORB ES PAR VOIE PERCUTAN E | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2001 | Translation filed | 29.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 25.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2010 | BE | 27.10.2010 | CY | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | GR | 28.01.2011 | ES | 07.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | IE | 07.04.2011 | LU | 07.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 07.04.2011 | ||
LU | 07.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 07.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [PXL]WO9953906 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [PXL] 1-9* page 11; example 6 * | International search | [X]JPH05946 (NICHIBAN KK); | [X]EP0580074 (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE], et al); | [X]JPH0640947 (T T S GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK); | [X]WO9616642 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [X]JPH09208464 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [X]WO9742952 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [A]JPH10204001 (KAO CORP); | [YP] - GORUKANTI, S. R., "Transdermal delivery of antiparkinsonian agent, benztropine I . Effect of vehicles on skin permeation", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (199911), vol. 192, no. 2, pages 159 - 172, XP002929113 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(99)00305-1 |