EP1188792 - FLAME-RETARDANT POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Dow Limited 15-3, Nihonbashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Sumitomo Dow Limited 15-3, Nihonbashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | ||
For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEYAMA, Satoshi Sumitomo Dow Limited, 10-1, Tsukahara 2-chome Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1046 / JP | 02 /
SHINOMIYA, Tadashi Sumitomo Dow Limited, 10-1, Tsukahara 2-chome Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1046 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Ichiro Sumitomo Dow Limited, 10-1, Tsukahara 2-chome Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1046 / JP | 04 /
IJI, Masatoshi Nec Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 05 /
SERIZAWA, Shin Nec Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Wilson Gunn Gee Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [2002/12] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00915548.2 | 14.04.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000JP02472 | Priority number, date | JP19990116560 | 23.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11656099 | [2002/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064976 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188792 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188792 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08K5/42, // (C08L69/00, 27:12), C08L83:04 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/36 (KR);
C08K5/42 (KR);
C08L27/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2201/02 (KR);
C08L2205/16 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L83/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/21] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDE POLYCARBONATHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2002/12] | English: | FLAME-RETARDANT POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION | [2002/12] | French: | COMPOSITION IGNIFUGE DE RESINE DE POLYCARBONATE | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | Translation filed | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3971756 (BIALOUS CHARLES A, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 4, line 32 - line 52; examples IV,XIV; claims 1-4; table - * * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 22 * [Y] 2,4-7,13; | [Y]GB1516544 (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 2,4,13* claim -; table - *; | [Y]EP0902060 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraph [0044]; examples 6-9,13-15 * | International search | [Y]US4387176 (FRYE ROBERT B); | [Y]JPH09151309 (DAICEL CHEM); | [Y]JPH1192678 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) |