Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3447270B | Global Dossier | 16.09.2003 | B2 | JP2002541711 | 03.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | KR0000301 | 03.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU746913B | Global Dossier | 02.05.2002 | B2 | AU3681700 | 23.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | KR0000301 | 03.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1092270 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2004 | B1 | EP1092270 | 11.06.2003 | A4 | EP1092270 | 18.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | KR0000301 | 03.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0005569 | 06.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | KR0000301 | 03.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2332990 | 17.10.2006 | C | CA2332990 | 12.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | KR0000301 | 03.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60015272T | 21.04.2005 | T2 | DE60015272D1 | 02.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | KR0000301 | 03.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0060751 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1140966C | 03.03.2004 | C | CN1297616 | 30.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100480286B | 06.04.2005 | B1 | KR20000066035 | 15.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2000130216 | 20.02.2004 | A | RU2186460 | 27.07.2002 | C1 | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6590951 | 08.07.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR19990012859 | 02.04.1999 |