EP1161586 - FACE FINISHING OF FABRICS CONTAINING IMMOBILIZED FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milliken & Company 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg, SC 29303 / US | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DISCHLER, Louis 252 West Park Drive Spartanburg, SC 29306 / US | 02 /
HENSON, Jimmy, B. 1171 Sunny Acres Road Pacolet Mills, SC 29373 / US | 03 /
MILLIKEN, Roger 627 Otis Boulevard Spartanburg, SC 29302 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00915785.0 | 16.02.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000US04007 | Priority number, date | US19990252513 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: US 252513 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049217 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161586 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D06C11/00 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
D03D15/00 (EP,US);
D03D15/217 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
D03D15/56 (EP,US);
D06C11/00 (EP,US);
D10B2201/02 (EP,US);
D10B2201/04 (EP,US);
D10B2201/08 (EP,US);
D10B2201/24 (EP,US);
D10B2211/02 (EP,US);
D10B2211/04 (EP,US);
D10B2331/021 (EP,US);
D10B2331/04 (EP,US);
D10B2331/10 (EP,US);
D10B2401/061 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2395 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23993 (EP,US);
Y10T442/30 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3065 (EP,US);
Y10T442/322 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3293 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3317 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/50] | D06C11/00, D06C19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON IMMOBILISIERTEN FASERN ENTHALTENDEN WARENBAHNEN | [2001/50] | English: | FACE FINISHING OF FABRICS CONTAINING IMMOBILIZED FIBERS | [2001/50] | French: | FINISSAGE DE L'ENDROIT DE TISSUS CONTENANT DES FIBRES IMMOBILISEES | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 27.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5415089 ; | [X]GB1171990 (CANTON TEXTILE MILLS [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 75 - line 91 * * page 6, line 60 - line 73 * * page 8, line 9 - line 13 *; | [A]US4084026 (GANDIA MANUEL TABERNER); | [X]JPH0797764 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 11, Database accession no. 1979-20645B, XP002408900 & JPS5415089 A 19790203 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1,6-8 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2107528 (FEINBERG BENJAMIN G); | [X]US2896304 (CARLO PERONI); | [A]US2926414 (ERNST WEISS, et al); | [A]US3549398 (WATSON GEORGE A); | [A]US3650800 (REINER MARTIN); | [X]US3894318 (ITO TOSHIO, et al) |